Southland Electrical & Refrigeration Limited (issued a business number of 9429032706031) was launched on 10 Jun 2008. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 85 Bill Richardson Drive, Avenal, Invercargill, 9810 (type: physical, registered). 228 Dee Street, Invercargill had been their physical address, up until 11 Oct 2017. Southland Electrical & Refrigeration Limited used more names, namely: Southland Farm Services Electrical Limited from 10 Jun 2008 to 16 Jul 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 85 shares (85 per cent of shares), namely:
Southland Farm Services Limited (an entity) located at Invercargill postcode 9810. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 15 per cent of all shares (15 shares); it includes
Nigel Brown (an individual) - located at Rd 9, Invercargill. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 24 Mar 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
85 Bill Richardson Drive, Avenal, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 11 Oct 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Donald Michael Vermeulen
Rd 2, Wanaka, 9382
Address used since 28 Oct 2011 |
Director | 10 Jun 2008 - current |
Mark Gordon Mcmillan
Rd 2, Invercargill, 9872
Address used since 19 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Jun 2008 - current |
Jeremy Matthew Irwin
Winton, Winton, 9720
Address used since 03 Oct 2017
Winton, 9720
Address used since 09 Oct 2018 |
Director | 03 Oct 2017 - 30 Mar 2020 |
Nigel James Brown
Rd 9, Invercargill, 9879
Address used since 04 Sep 2013 |
Director | 10 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
228 Dee Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 10 Jun 2008 - 11 Oct 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Southland Farm Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037992750 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Invercargill 9810 |
10 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigel James Brown Individual |
Rd 9 Invercargill 9879 |
10 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeremy Matthew Irwin Individual |
Winton Winton 9720 |
03 Oct 2017 - 06 Jul 2020 |
The Southland Branch Of The New Zealand Dental Association Incorporated Opus House |
|
Country & Co Syndication Limited 33 Arena Avenue |
|
Online Computer Consultants Limited 64 Arena Avenue |
|
P & R Hickmott Trustee Co Limited 42-48 Arena Avenue |
|
Windsor Architectural Hardware Limited 42-48 Arena Avenue |
|
Rk Hospitality Limited 9 Fox Street |