Jjjc Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032724004) was started on 25 Jun 2008. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 35 Norton Road, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 (type: office, delivery). 81 Joyce Road, R D 3, Tauranga had been their physical address, up to 21 Sep 2015. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 45 shares (45 per cent of shares), namely:
Church, David John (an individual) located at Otumoetai, Tauranga postcode 3110,
Church, Mary Jane (an individual) located at Otumoetai, Tauranga postcode 3110,
Holland Beckett Trustee No.7 Limited (an entity) located at 525 Cameron Road, Tauranga postcode 3110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 53 per cent of all shares (53 shares); it includes
Jensen, Julie Anne (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Tauranga. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Church, David John, located at Otumoetai, Tauranga (an individual). "Holder investor farms and farm animals" (business classification L662070) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Jjjc Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 27 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35 Norton Road, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & service & registered | 21 Sep 2015 |
35 Norton Road, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 | Office & delivery & postal | 10 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David John Church
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 25 Jun 2008 - current |
Julie Anne Jensen
Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 27 Jun 2008 - current |
35 Norton Road , Otumoetai , Tauranga , 3110 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
81 Joyce Road, R D 3, Tauranga, 3173 | Physical | 17 Sep 2014 - 21 Sep 2015 |
81 Joyce Road, R D 3, Tauranga, 3173 | Registered | 23 Oct 2013 - 21 Sep 2015 |
57 Joyce Road, Pyes Pa, Tauranga | Physical | 25 Jun 2008 - 17 Sep 2014 |
57 Joyce Road, Pyes Pa, Tauranga | Registered | 25 Jun 2008 - 23 Oct 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, David John Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Church, Mary Jane Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.7 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033644523 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jensen, Julie Anne Individual |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, David John Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Church, Mary Jane Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
25 Jun 2008 - current |
Shemlyco Limited 35 Norton Road |
|
Hyperion Consultancy Limited 41 Lemon Grove Avenue |
|
Papango Investment Trustee Limited 28 Tirinui Crest Road |
|
Gainsborough Investments Limited 32 Norton Road |
|
E5 Group Limited 51 Freyberg Street |
|
Nelson & Smith Limited 36a Lemon Grove Avenue |
Eye Spy Limited 44 Brown Street |
Riverside Flats Limited 247 Cameron Road |
Eieio Farms Limited 341b Oceanbeach Road |
Archer Farms Trust Limited 153 Armadale Road |
Bmrussell Limited 22 Roydon Downs Road |
Bydand Holdings Limited 101 Arawa Street |