D J & D A Anderson Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429032766370) was launched on 20 May 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical). 30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 12 Jul 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 4 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Chapman, Ewan John (an individual) located at Cashmere, Christchurch,
Anderson, Douglas James (an individual) located at Rd 3, Gore,
Anderson, Denise Anne (an individual) located at Rd 3, Gore. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Anderson, Denise Anne (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Gore. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Anderson, Douglas James, located at Rd 3, Gore (an individual). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Jul 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Douglas James Anderson
Rd 3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 20 May 2008 |
Director | 20 May 2008 - current |
Denise Anne Anderson
Rd 3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 20 May 2008 |
Director | 20 May 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 01 Sep 2014 - 12 Jul 2017 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 29 Jan 2013 - 01 Sep 2014 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical | 29 Jan 2013 - 12 Jul 2017 |
Hsbc Tower, Level 8, 62 Worcester Boulevard, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 08 Aug 2012 - 29 Jan 2013 |
C/-polson Higgs, Hsbc Tower, Level 8, 62, Worcester Boulevard, Christchurch 8140 | Registered & physical | 03 Nov 2009 - 08 Aug 2012 |
Polson Higgs, Clarendon Tower, Cnr, Worcester St & Oxford Tce, Christchurch, 8140 | Registered & physical | 15 Aug 2008 - 03 Nov 2009 |
770 Winding Creek Road, Rd 3, Gore | Registered & physical | 20 May 2008 - 15 Aug 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Ewan John Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch |
20 May 2008 - current |
Anderson, Douglas James Individual |
Rd 3 Gore |
20 May 2008 - current |
Anderson, Denise Anne Individual |
Rd 3 Gore |
20 May 2008 - current |
Awatere Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045994258 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch 8013 |
12 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Denise Anne Individual |
Rd 3 Gore |
20 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Douglas James Individual |
Rd 3 Gore |
20 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bolderston, Geoffrey Anthony Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
20 May 2008 - 12 May 2017 |
Kitz Investments Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Roading And Building Cartage Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Weir Nominees Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Mackay Trustees 2013 Limited 287 - 293 Durham Street |
|
L & P Build Limited 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch Central |
|
Tai Tapu Milk Company Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |