Bk Riversdale Trustees Limited (issued a business number of 9429032800340) was incorporated on 10 Apr 2008. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 144 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 (type: physical, registered). C/-Brophy Knight Limited, 144 Tancred Street, Ashburton had been their physical address, up to 17 Aug 2011. 120 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Schoonderbeek, Marcus Martinus (a director) located at Allenton, Ashburton postcode 7700. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Wall, Gregory David (a director) - located at Rd 2, Ashburton. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Adam, Brendon John, located at Ashburton (a director). Businesscheck's data was updated on 16 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
144 Tancred Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Aug 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brendon John Adam
Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 29 May 2017 |
Director | 01 Jan 2009 - current |
Gregory David Wall
Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772
Address used since 08 May 2019
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 01 Jan 2017 |
Director | 01 Jan 2017 - current |
Marcus Martinus Schoonderbeek
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 01 Jan 2017 |
Director | 01 Jan 2017 - current |
Emma Amelia Hastings
Tinwald, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 01 Jan 2024 |
Director | 01 Jan 2024 - current |
Angus James Lindsay
Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772
Address used since 01 Jan 2024 |
Director | 01 Jan 2024 - current |
Mitchell Philip Bellew
Rd 4, Ashburton, 7774
Address used since 28 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Apr 2008 - 31 Dec 2021 |
Graham Russell Kennedy
Rd 4, Ashburton, 7774
Address used since 28 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Apr 2008 - 23 Sep 2019 |
David Peter Fisher
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 28 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Apr 2008 - 01 Jan 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-brophy Knight Limited, 144 Tancred Street, Ashburton | Physical & registered | 10 Apr 2008 - 17 Aug 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schoonderbeek, Marcus Martinus Director |
Allenton Ashburton 7700 |
02 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wall, Gregory David Director |
Rd 2 Ashburton 7772 |
02 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Adam, Brendon John Director |
Ashburton 7700 |
02 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brophy Knight Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037701307 Company Number: 938244 Entity |
Ashburton 7700 |
10 Apr 2008 - 02 Dec 2022 |
Effective Date | 27 Aug 2015 |
Name | Brophy Knight Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 938244 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
144 Tancred Street Ashburton 7700 |
Demeter Fields Limited 144 Tancred Street |
|
Edsal Limited 144 Tancred Street |
|
Jmd Dairy Limited 144 Tancred Street |
|
Lionfern Limited 144 Tancred Street |
|
Matikas Dairies Limited 144 Tancred Street |
|
Read Agriculture Limited 144 Tancred Street |