Plywood City Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032873856) was incorporated on 04 Mar 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3/525 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 (type: registered, physical). 126 Portage Road, Otahuhu, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 14 Mar 2012. 176001 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 176001 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Delany, Barry Owen (a director) located at Hilltop, Taupo postcode 3330. The Businesscheck information was updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3/525 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Mar 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Barry Owen Delany
Hilltop, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 04 Apr 2023
Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 28 Apr 2017 |
Director | 04 Mar 2008 - current |
Sherilyn Clarke
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 28 Apr 2017 |
Director | 25 Nov 2009 - 30 Apr 2017 |
Peter Carleton Gibson
Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932
Address used since 01 Nov 2010 |
Director | 01 Nov 2010 - 30 Apr 2017 |
Gary Traveller
Acacia Bay, Rd 5, Taupo, 3385
Address used since 27 Nov 2014 |
Director | 01 Nov 2010 - 30 Apr 2017 |
Peter Alan Henry
Taupo,
Address used since 04 Mar 2008 |
Director | 04 Mar 2008 - 04 Dec 2009 |
Vaughan Stewart Darby
Orewa,
Address used since 04 Mar 2008 |
Director | 04 Mar 2008 - 21 Oct 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
126 Portage Road, Otahuhu, Auckland | Registered & physical | 07 May 2009 - 14 Mar 2012 |
1st Floor Le Rew Building, 2 Heuheu Street, Taupo | Registered & physical | 04 Mar 2008 - 07 May 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Delany, Barry Owen Director |
Hilltop Taupo 3330 |
04 Apr 2018 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Ply City Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1700919 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Travers Management Consulting Limited 525 Great South Road |
|
Cornwell Commercial Properties Limited 525 Great South Road |
|
No Cigar Limited 4/525 Great South Road |
|
Scott Electrical East Tamaki Limited 525 Great South Road |
|
Sc1 Limited 3/525 Great South Road |
|
Alupanel New Zealand Limited 3/525 Great South Road |