Bell Road Estate Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032991789) was launched on 07 Dec 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3 Bennett Street, Motueka, Motueka 7120, 7120 (type: registered, physical). 200 Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson had been their physical address, until 19 Aug 2020. Bell Road Estate Limited used more aliases, namely: Pope Jam Limited from 07 Dec 2007 to 29 May 2008. 500000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 125000 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Strang, Andrea Jane (an individual) located at Rd 1, Brightwater postcode 7091. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (125000 shares); it includes
Strang, Dorje James (a director) - located at Rd 1, Brightwater. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (250000 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Thunderbolt Holdings Limited, located at Motueka, Motueka 7120 (an entity). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3 Bennett Street, Motueka, Motueka 7120, 7120 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dorje James Strang
Rd 1, Brightwater, 7091
Address used since 27 Oct 2011 |
Director | 29 May 2008 - current |
Lindsay Strang
Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 28 May 2008 - 31 Mar 2023 |
David Leith Sherriff
Richmond, Nelson,
Address used since 07 Dec 2007 |
Director | 07 Dec 2007 - 30 May 2008 |
Nicholas Philip Dangerfield
Wellington,
Address used since 07 Dec 2007 |
Director | 07 Dec 2007 - 29 May 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
200 Hardy Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Physical & registered | 04 Jul 2017 - 19 Aug 2020 |
155a Trafalgar Street, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 04 Nov 2011 - 04 Jul 2017 |
David Sherriff Limited, 155a Trafalgar Street, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 11 Oct 2010 - 04 Nov 2011 |
Brimble Sherriff Young Limited, 155a Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered & physical | 07 Dec 2007 - 11 Oct 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Strang, Andrea Jane Individual |
Rd 1 Brightwater 7091 |
17 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Strang, Dorje James Director |
Rd 1 Brightwater 7091 |
17 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thunderbolt Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036712724 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Motueka Motueka 7120 7120 |
30 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Strang, Lindsay Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
30 May 2008 - 17 Apr 2023 |
Strang, Genevieve Anne Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
30 May 2008 - 17 Apr 2023 |
Peace Of Mind Admin Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034033432 Company Number: 1832438 Entity |
07 Dec 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Peace Of Mind Admin Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034033432 Company Number: 1832438 Entity |
07 Dec 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Nelson District Free Kindergarten Association (incorporated) 200 Hardy Street |
|
Abbeyfield Foundation Charitable Trust Level One Concordia House |
|
Interim Lodge Trust C/o Mr D J F Slow, Solicitor |
|
Trafalgar Foods Limited 279 Trafalgar Street |
|
Sturgess Holdings Limited Level 2 |
|
Lone Star Farms Limited Level 2 |