Ferry Reserve Lime Company Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033030159) was launched on 21 Nov 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 306A Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: physical, registered). 306A Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up until 27 Oct 2015. 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 250 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Eales, David Delmore (an individual) located at Palmerston North. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 25% of all shares (exactly 250 shares); it includes
Eales, David Delmore (an individual) - located at Palmerston North,
Hoult, Brent Christopher (an individual) - located at Palmerston North. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (250 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Northcott, Michael, located at Woodville (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
306a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Oct 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brent Christopher Hoult
Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 25 Nov 2015 |
Director | 21 Nov 2007 - current |
David Delmore Eales
Palmerston North, 4412
Address used since 25 Nov 2015 |
Director | 21 Nov 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
306a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & registered | 01 Dec 2010 - 27 Oct 2015 |
C/-m R Curd Limited, 306a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North | Physical | 05 Oct 2009 - 01 Dec 2010 |
C/-m R Curd Limited, 306a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North | Registered | 21 Sep 2009 - 01 Dec 2010 |
Unit 11, Northcote Office Park, 80 Grey Street, Palmerston North | Registered | 21 Nov 2007 - 21 Sep 2009 |
Unit 11, Northcote Office Park, 80 Grey Street, Palmerston North | Physical | 21 Nov 2007 - 05 Oct 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eales, David Delmore Individual |
Palmerston North |
21 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eales, David Delmore Individual |
Palmerston North |
21 Nov 2007 - current |
Hoult, Brent Christopher Individual |
Palmerston North |
21 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Northcott, Michael Individual |
Woodville |
21 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hoult, Brent Christopher Individual |
Palmerston North |
21 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hoult - Executor Of Estate Of Peter Hoult, Brent Christopher Individual |
Fitzherbert Palmerston North 4410 |
23 Nov 2020 - 03 Aug 2022 |
Grant - Executor Of Estate Peter Hoult, Carol Individual |
Ashhurst Ashhurst 4810 |
23 Nov 2020 - 03 Aug 2022 |
Hoult, Peter Clive Individual |
Palmerston North |
21 Nov 2007 - 23 Nov 2020 |
Neil Tobin Orthodontics Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |
|
Customised Distribution Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |
|
Clervaux Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |
|
La Farming Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |
|
Under Construction Building Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |
|
Trustee Solutions (2012) Limited 306a Broadway Avenue |