Tamau Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033048888) was incorporated on 26 Nov 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 6 Woodward Street, Nukuhau, Taupo, 3330 (type: physical, registered). 14 Woodward Street, Nukuhau, Taupo had been their registered address, up until 10 May 2018. 120 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Sproat, John Gilbert (an individual) located at Bluff Hill, Napier postcode 4110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Loughlin, Thomas William (a director) - located at Nukuhau, Taupo. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Orr, Adrian, located at Te Aro, Wellington (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 11 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Woodward Street, Nukuhau, Taupo, 3330 | Physical & registered & service | 10 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Adrian Brent Orr
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 14 Apr 2020
Narrow Neck, North Shore City, 0624
Address used since 17 Mar 2010
Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 02 May 2018 |
Director | 16 Sep 2009 - current |
John Gilbert Sproat
Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 16 Sep 2009 |
Director | 16 Sep 2009 - current |
Thomas William Loughlin
Nukuhau, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 02 May 2018
Nukuhau, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 17 Mar 2010 |
Director | 16 Sep 2009 - current |
Phillip Alfred Stevenson
Hauraki, North Shore City, 0622
Address used since 26 Nov 2007 |
Director | 26 Nov 2007 - 05 May 2010 |
Mark Xavier Franklin
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 17 Mar 2010 |
Director | 23 Feb 2010 - 05 May 2010 |
John Mcfadyen Rae
Remuera, Auckland 1050,
Address used since 26 Nov 2007 |
Director | 26 Nov 2007 - 24 Feb 2010 |
William Temuera Robert Hall
Acacia Bay, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 26 Nov 2007 |
Director | 26 Nov 2007 - 16 Sep 2009 |
6 Woodward Street , Nukuhau , Taupo , 3330 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14 Woodward Street, Nukuhau, Taupo, 3330 | Registered & physical | 28 Jul 2016 - 10 May 2018 |
137 Tongariro Street, Taupo, 3330 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2011 - 28 Jul 2016 |
137 Tongariro Street, Taupo 3330 | Physical & registered | 25 May 2010 - 13 May 2011 |
99 Gavin Street, Ellerslie, Auckland 1060 | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2009 - 25 May 2010 |
364 East Tamaki Road, East Tamaki, Manukau 2013 | Physical & registered | 26 Nov 2007 - 29 Jun 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sproat, John Gilbert Individual |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 |
21 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Loughlin, Thomas William Director |
Nukuhau Taupo 3330 |
21 Feb 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Orr, Adrian Individual |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
13 May 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tem Corporation Aotearoa Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037065683 Company Number: 1104105 Entity |
21 Feb 2018 - 13 May 2019 | |
Orr, Susan Margaret Individual |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 |
21 Feb 2018 - 13 May 2019 |
Kai Waho Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034417003 Company Number: 1733180 Entity |
Nukuhau Taupo 3330 |
26 Nov 2007 - 21 Feb 2018 |
Stevenson Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038231681 Company Number: 827774 Entity |
26 Nov 2007 - 26 Nov 2007 | |
Kai Waho Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034417003 Company Number: 1733180 Entity |
Nukuhau Taupo 3330 |
26 Nov 2007 - 21 Feb 2018 |
Stevenson Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038231681 Company Number: 827774 Entity |
26 Nov 2007 - 26 Nov 2007 | |
Tem Corporation Aotearoa Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037065683 Company Number: 1104105 Entity |
Narrow Neck Auckland 0624 |
21 Feb 2018 - 13 May 2019 |
Kai Waho Limited 6 Woodward Street |
|
Navarre Road Investments Limited 24 Woodward Street |
|
Destinate NZ Limited 24 Woodward Street |
|
Teorangi Properties Limited 1 Kaiuru Street |
|
H & R Davis Limited 48 Woodward Street |
|
Maori Land Counselling Services 12 Pitiroi Street |