Nz Samra Limited (issued a business number of 9429033067322) was started on 25 Oct 2007. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga had been their physical address, up until 10 Jun 2021. 120 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Kaur, Paramjit (an individual) located at Pyes Pa, Tauranga postcode 3112. The Businesscheck data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
C/-cronin Cullen Egan Limited, 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 23 Jan 2009 |
37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 31 May 2021 |
37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paramjit Kaur
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 22 Mar 2019
Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 21 Mar 2016 |
Director | 18 Jan 2010 - current |
Sukhdev Singh
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 22 Mar 2019
Bellevue, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 17 Nov 2011 |
Director | 17 Nov 2011 - 25 Jun 2021 |
Kamaldeep Kaur
Tauranga, 3110,
Address used since 18 Jan 2010 |
Director | 18 Jan 2010 - 18 Nov 2011 |
Karanjit Kaur
Tauranga, 3110,
Address used since 18 Jan 2010 |
Director | 18 Jan 2010 - 18 Nov 2011 |
Sukhdev Singh
Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 25 Oct 2007 |
Director | 25 Oct 2007 - 18 Jan 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 10 Apr 2018 - 10 Jun 2021 |
30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 30 Jan 2009 - 10 Apr 2018 |
97 Edgecumbe Road, Tauranga | Physical & registered | 28 Jan 2008 - 30 Jan 2009 |
58 A Carlton Street, Tauranga | Registered | 25 Oct 2007 - 28 Jan 2008 |
C/o Ataxz Accountants, Upstairs 147 Chadwick Rd, Greerton, Tauranga | Physical | 25 Oct 2007 - 28 Jan 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaur, Paramjit Individual |
Pyes Pa Tauranga 3112 |
12 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaur, Kamaldeep Individual |
Tauranga 3110 |
12 Oct 2009 - 17 Oct 2016 |
Singh, Sukhdev Individual |
Pyes Pa Tauranga 3112 |
17 Oct 2016 - 11 May 2023 |
Kaur, Karamjit Individual |
Tauranga 3110 |
12 Oct 2009 - 17 Oct 2016 |
Singh, Sukhdev Individual |
Tauranga |
25 Oct 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Fisk Concrete Contracting 2011 Limited 30 Cameron Road |
|
Camel Properties Limited 30 Cameron Road |
|
Bm Autobahn Limited 30 Cameron Road |
|
Day Property Limited 30 Cameron Road |
|
Lloyd James Construction Limited 30 Cameron Road |
|
Direct Spa Pools Limited 30 Cameron Road |