H R Davies Family Trustee Company Limited (NZBN 9429033133645) was started on 14 Sep 2007. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 131 Kaipikari Road Upper, Rd 45, Urenui, 4375 (type: registered, service). 7 Liardet Street, New Plymouth had been their physical address, up until 22 Jul 2019. 110 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (90.91 per cent of shares), namely:
Davies, Harold Ross (an individual) located at Rd 45, Urenui postcode 4375. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 9.09 per cent of all shares (10 shares); it includes
Wilkinson, Linda Margaret Rose (an individual) - located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 11 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Eliot Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered & service | 22 Jul 2019 |
131 Kaipikari Road Upper, Rd 45, Urenui, 4375 | Registered & service | 12 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Harold Ross Davies
Rd 45, Urenui, 4375
Address used since 13 Sep 2021
Rd45 Urenui, Taranaki, 4375
Address used since 23 Sep 2015 |
Director | 14 Sep 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7 Liardet Street, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered | 15 Dec 2011 - 22 Jul 2019 |
C/-everest Vincent Accountants, Cnr Gill & Gover Streets, New Plymouth | Registered & physical | 14 Sep 2007 - 15 Dec 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davies, Harold Ross Individual |
Rd 45 Urenui 4375 |
14 Sep 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilkinson, Linda Margaret Rose Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4312 |
23 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ebert, Stephen Robert Individual |
7 Young Street New Plymouth |
14 Sep 2007 - 23 Apr 2015 |
Declutter Limited 7 Liardet Street |
|
Off Road Refunds Limited 7 Liardet Street |
|
Djr Tamarack Trustees Limited 7 Liardet Street |
|
Control It Limited 7 Liardet Street |
|
Butterfly Preschool Limited 7 Liardet Street |
|
Ysfn Properties Limited 7 Liardet Street |