Port Aquaculture Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033212944) was launched on 06 Aug 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (type: registered, physical). 22 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim had been their physical address, up to 29 May 2017. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Schwass, Andrew Terence (an individual) located at Picton, Picton postcode 7220. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 99 per cent of all shares (99 shares); it includes
Schwass, Andrew Terence (an individual) - located at Picton, Picton,
Andrew Schwass Children's Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Mayfield, Blenheim. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical & service | 29 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Terence Schwass
Picton, Picton, 7220
Address used since 05 Feb 2014 |
Director | 06 Aug 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
22 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered | 02 Mar 2016 - 29 May 2017 |
22 Scott Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical | 20 Feb 2015 - 02 Mar 2016 |
Tva Limited, Chartered Accountants, 52 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered | 12 Feb 2013 - 20 Feb 2015 |
Tva Lock Limited, Chartered Accountants, 52 Scott Street, Blenheim | Registered & physical | 06 Aug 2007 - 12 Feb 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schwass, Andrew Terence Individual |
Picton Picton 7220 |
06 Aug 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schwass, Andrew Terence Individual |
Picton Picton 7220 |
06 Aug 2007 - current |
Andrew Schwass Children's Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033206646 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mayfield Blenheim 7201 |
06 Aug 2007 - current |
Wairau River Wines Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
8 Wired Brewing Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Bryce Trustee Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Alva Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Crow Tavern Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
G & S Moleta Trustee Limited 2 Alfred Street |