Craftcorp Group Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033364896) was started on 30 May 2007. 1 address is in use by the company: 57 Marlborough Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: registered, physical). 74 Peary Road, Mount Eden, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 12 May 2016. Craftcorp Group Limited used more names, namely: Craftcorp Group Limited from 30 May 2007 to 30 Apr 2014. 74000 shares are allocated to 8 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (0.07 per cent of shares), namely:
Carl Matthews (an individual) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 2.3 per cent of all shares (1700 shares); it includes
Carl Matthews (an individual) - located at Mount Eden, Auckland,
Vanessa Matthews (an individual) - located at Mount Eden, Auckland. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (13100 shares, 17.7%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Carl Matthews, located at Mount Eden, Auckland (an individual),
Vanessa Matthews, located at Mount Eden, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 14 Nov 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
57 Marlborough Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & physical | 12 May 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Michael Matthews
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 04 May 2016 |
Director | 20 Apr 2012 - current |
Bayard James Sinnema
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 01 Apr 2013 |
Director | 30 May 2007 - 27 May 2014 |
Roy Anthony Edwards
Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 30 May 2007 |
Director | 30 May 2007 - 05 Dec 2012 |
57 Marlborough Street , Mount Eden , Auckland , 1024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
74 Peary Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2015 - 12 May 2016 |
6 Volcanic Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1041 | Physical & registered | 07 May 2012 - 13 May 2015 |
65 Tom Muir Drive, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 30 May 2007 - 07 May 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Michael Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Michael Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - current |
Vanessa Louise Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
10 Dec 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Michael Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - current |
Vanessa Louise Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
10 Dec 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vanessa Louise Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
10 Dec 2019 - current |
Carl Michael Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Vanessa Louise Matthews Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
10 Dec 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl And Vanessa Matthews As Trustees For The Matthews Family Trust Other |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - 10 Dec 2019 |
The Business Activist Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039647634 Company Number: 332585 Entity |
05 Jun 2007 - 06 Dec 2012 | |
Carl And Vanessa Matthews As Trustees For The Matthews Family Trust Other |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - 10 Dec 2019 |
Carl And Vanessa Matthews As Trustees For The Matthews Family Trust Other |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
23 Apr 2012 - 10 Dec 2019 |
Roy Anthony Edwards Individual |
Tauranga |
30 May 2007 - 10 Mar 2011 |
The Business Activist Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039647634 Company Number: 332585 Entity |
05 Jun 2007 - 06 Dec 2012 | |
Null - Bjs Trust Other |
30 May 2007 - 29 May 2014 | |
Bayard Sinnema Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland |
30 May 2007 - 10 Mar 2011 |
Roy Anthony Edwards Director |
Tauranga 3112 |
01 Aug 2011 - 06 Dec 2012 |
Bjs Trust Other |
30 May 2007 - 29 May 2014 | |
Roy Anthony Edwards Individual |
Tauranga 3112 |
01 Aug 2011 - 06 Dec 2012 |
Devmark Trading Limited 57 Marlborough Street |
|
August Avenue Limited 51 Marlborough Street |
|
Genero Management Limited 51 Marlborough Street |
|
Seventy2 Limited 51 Marlborough Street |
|
Dr Liz Catherwood Limited 23 Burnley Terrace |
|
Richard Parker Investments Limited 21 Burnley Terrace |