Hmc Transport Limited (issued a business number of 9429033401379) was started on 11 May 2007. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 13 San Carlo Court, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 (type: postal, office). C/-Sba Henderson, 6A Catherine Place, Henderson, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 19 Oct 2009. Hmc Transport Limited used other aliases, namely: Cool V (2007) Limited from 11 May 2007 to 06 Aug 2008. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Cubillan, Harry (an individual) located at Henderson, Auckland. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Cubillan, Margie (an individual) - located at Henderson, Auckland. "Courier service" (ANZSIC I510210) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Hmc Transport Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
13 San Carlo Court, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Registered | 11 May 2007 |
13 San Carlo Court, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Physical & service | 19 Oct 2009 |
13 San Carlo Court, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Postal & office | 25 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Harry Yu Cubillan
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 10 Nov 2015 |
Director | 10 Nov 2015 - current |
Margie Derecho Cubillan
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 10 Nov 2015 |
Director | 10 Nov 2015 - current |
Hanz Cubillan
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 21 Aug 2012 |
Director | 21 Aug 2012 - 12 Nov 2015 |
Margie Cubillan
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 11 May 2007 |
Director | 11 May 2007 - 22 Aug 2012 |
Harry Cubillan
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 11 May 2007 |
Director | 11 May 2007 - 22 Aug 2012 |
13 San Carlo Court , Henderson , Auckland , 0612 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-sba Henderson, 6a Catherine Place, Henderson, Auckland | Physical | 11 May 2007 - 19 Oct 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cubillan, Harry Individual |
Henderson, Auckland |
11 May 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cubillan, Margie Individual |
Henderson, Auckland |
11 May 2007 - current |
Jitrass Investments Silverdale Limited 7 San Carlo Court |
|
Jitrass Investments Limited 7 San Carlo Court |
|
Ric Hong Acupuncture Clinic Limited 220 Sturges Road |
|
Great Escapes Bucket List Limited 18 San Domingo Rise |
|
R&g Cafe Limited 8 San Diego Court |
|
Sabrade Properties Limited 25 San Bernadino Drive |
Zohebz Transport Limited 19 San Vito Place |
Sai Couriers Limited 2 Riesling Place |
Frageh Limited 58 Highfields Terrace |
V S Naidu Limited 16 Spence Road |
Jdat Prakash Limited 24 Gendo Avenue |
Kaushik Transport Limited 46 Mili Way |