Pegasus Civil Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033442440) was launched on 27 Apr 2007. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 100 Karamu Road North, Hastings, 4122 (type: registered, service). P K F Carr & Stanton Ltd, 119 Queen Street East, Hastings 4122 had been their physical address, up until 10 May 2011. 120 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 119 shares (99.17 per cent of shares), namely:
Heretaunga Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Hastings postcode 4122,
Heaps, Daniel Lyall (an individual) located at Cashmere, Christchurch postcode 8022. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Heaps, Daniel Lyall (an individual) - located at Cashmere, Christchurch. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
119 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered & service | 10 May 2011 |
100 Karamu Road North, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & service | 29 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daniel Lyall Heaps
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 30 Jan 2023
Somerfield, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 30 Jan 2020
Taradale, Napier, 4112
Address used since 26 Feb 2016 |
Director | 27 Apr 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
P K F Carr & Stanton Ltd, 119 Queen Street East, Hastings 4122 | Physical & registered | 22 Dec 2008 - 10 May 2011 |
Horwath Carr & Stanton Ltd, 119 Queen Street East, Hastings 4122 | Physical & registered | 07 Oct 2008 - 22 Dec 2008 |
119 Queen St East, Hastings | Registered & physical | 27 Apr 2007 - 07 Oct 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heretaunga Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037297275 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hastings 4122 |
27 Apr 2007 - current |
Heaps, Daniel Lyall Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
27 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heaps, Daniel Lyall Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
27 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heaps, Jacqueline Anne Individual |
Taradale Napier 4112 |
27 Apr 2007 - 20 Feb 2020 |
Heaps, Jacqueline Anne Individual |
Taradale Napier 4112 |
27 Apr 2007 - 20 Feb 2020 |
Heaps, Jacqueline Anne Individual |
Taradale Napier 4112 |
27 Apr 2007 - 20 Feb 2020 |
Mj Uka Foods Limited 119 Queens Street East |
|
Apollo Foods Limited 119 Queen Street East |
|
Havelock North Supermarket Limited 119 Queen Street East |
|
Heretaunga Trustees (smith) Limited 119 Queen Street East |
|
Magiq Software Limited 119 Queen Street East |
|
Benson Group Limited 119 Queen Street East |