K P i Rothschild Property Group Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429033458151) was incorporated on 15 May 2007. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Suite 1, 225 High Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (type: other, records). 12000000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 4000000 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Kpi Group Holdings Limited (an entity) located at 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch, Null postcode 8013. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (4000000 shares); it includes
City Group Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (4000000 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rga Group Holdings Limited, located at 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch, Null (an entity). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Dec 2013 |
Suite 1, 225 High Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 11 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Allan Royston Marshall
Rd 1, Kumaru, 7875
Address used since 04 May 2010
Cracroft, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 04 May 2010 |
Director | 15 May 2007 - current |
Shaun Timothy Mark Stockman
Rd5, Christchurch, 7676
Address used since 05 Mar 2013 |
Director | 15 May 2007 - current |
Dean Peter Hayman Marshall
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 09 May 2018
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 21 Jul 2015
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 09 May 2018 |
Director | 15 May 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kpi Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030786981 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
83 Victoria Street Christchurch Null 8013 |
05 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
City Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032955255 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
83 Victoria Street Christchurch 8013 |
16 Feb 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rga Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030151758 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
83 Victoria Street Christchurch Null 8013 |
05 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kensington Park Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036755417 Company Number: 1165080 Entity |
15 May 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Rothschild Goldstein & Associates Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864140 Company Number: 1145341 Entity |
15 May 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Rothschild Goldstein & Associates Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864140 Company Number: 1145341 Entity |
16 Feb 2009 - 05 Feb 2014 | |
Rothschild Goldstein & Associates Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864140 Company Number: 1145341 Entity |
16 Feb 2009 - 05 Feb 2014 | |
Kensington Park Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036755417 Company Number: 1165080 Entity |
16 Feb 2009 - 05 Feb 2014 | |
Kensington Park Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036755417 Company Number: 1165080 Entity |
15 May 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Rothschild Goldstein & Associates Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036864140 Company Number: 1145341 Entity |
15 May 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Kensington Park Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036755417 Company Number: 1165080 Entity |
16 Feb 2009 - 05 Feb 2014 |
Simplex Cc Trading Limited 83 Victoria Street |
|
Annandale Enterprises Limited 83 Victoria Street |
|
Ideal Tyre Imports 2013 Limited Level 2 |
|
Kpi Group 196 Limited Level 2 |
|
Kpi Group 234 Limited Level 2 |
|
Kpi Group 14-20 Limited Level 2 |