Flagstaff Holdings Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033460437) was registered on 17 Apr 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Second Avenue, Avenues, Whangarei, 0112 (type: registered, physical). 2 Manse Street, Regent, Whangarei had been their registered address, up until 13 Apr 2021. 120 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
King, Timothy William (an individual) located at Regent, Whangarei. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Baird, Karen Zoe (an individual) - located at Regent, Whangerei. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Breedt, Debrah, located at Regent, Whangarei (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Second Avenue, Avenues, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy William King
Regent, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 06 Feb 2010 |
Director | 17 Apr 2007 - current |
Karen Zoe Baird
Regent, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 06 Feb 2010 |
Director | 17 Apr 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Manse Street, Regent, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical | 12 Feb 2010 - 13 Apr 2021 |
C/o Gilligan Rowe & Associates Limited, Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & registered | 17 Apr 2007 - 12 Feb 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King, Timothy William Individual |
Regent Whangarei |
17 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baird, Karen Zoe Individual |
Regent Whangerei |
17 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Breedt, Debrah Individual |
Regent Whangarei 0112 |
11 Apr 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ledingham, Jonathan Michael Stannard Individual |
Dargaville |
17 Apr 2007 - 11 Apr 2011 |
Ciel.k Limited 2 Manse Street |
|
Evil Developments Limited 212 |
|
Edesia Food Limited 214 Bank Street |
|
Me.co.nz Limited 206 Bank Street |
|
Parihaka Property Trust 202 Bank Street |
|
Whangarei Baptist Social Services Board 202 Bank Street |