Red Dragon Group Limited (issued a business number of 9429033578279) was started on 23 Mar 2007. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 8 Melrose Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). L2, 136 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Mar 2016. Red Dragon Group Limited used other names, namely: Kiwi Lodge Holdings Limited from 23 Mar 2007 to 27 Jun 2013. 100 shares are issued to 6 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 20 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Enclosure Trustee Co Limited (an entity) located at Level 2, Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052,
Powell, Gerome Thomas (an individual) located at Mission Bay, Auckland postcode 1071. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Professional Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Newmarket, Auckland,
Powell, Gaye Lynette (an individual) - located at Mission Bay, Auckland,
Powell, Nigel Frederick (an individual) - located at Mission Bay, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (30 shares, 30%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mozart Nominees Limited, located at Newmarket, Auckland (an entity). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Melrose St, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 03 Mar 2016 |
8 Melrose Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 03 Mar 2016 |
8 Melrose Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Mar 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigel Frederick Powell
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 23 Feb 2017 |
Director | 23 Mar 2007 - current |
Gerome Thomas Powell
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 26 Oct 2017
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Feb 2014 |
Director | 27 Feb 2014 - current |
Graeme Marten Edwards
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 03 Mar 2016 |
Director | 23 Mar 2007 - 28 Aug 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
L2, 136 Parnell Rd, Parnell, Auckland | Registered & physical | 23 Mar 2007 - 11 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Enclosure Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046047809 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Level 2, Parnell Auckland 1052 |
26 Oct 2017 - current |
Powell, Gerome Thomas Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
27 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031943734 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
27 Feb 2014 - current |
Powell, Gaye Lynette Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
27 Feb 2014 - current |
Powell, Nigel Frederick Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
23 Mar 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mozart Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038339882 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
27 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Edwards, Graeme Marten Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
23 Mar 2007 - 27 Feb 2014 |
Argyle Estates Limited 8 Melrose Street |
|
Ferguson Wade Investments Limited 8 D Melrose Street |
|
Argyle Asset Management Limited 8 Melrose Street |
|
Auckland Memorial Park And Cemetery Limited 8 Melrose St |
|
4under5 Trustees Limited 8d Melrose Street |
|
Stuart Bilby Engineers Limited 8d Melrose Street |