Wrc Developments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033666822) was started on 02 Feb 2007. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Flat 5, 17 Leyland Street, Onekawa, Napier, 4110 (type: registered, service). 36 Leyland Street, Onekawa, Napier had been their registered address, until 23 Nov 2023. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Neale, Paula Louise (an individual) located at Bay View, Napier postcode 4104. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Neale, Rupert Graham (an individual) - located at Bay View, Napier. Our database was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36 Leyland Street, Onekawa, Napier, 4110 | Physical | 02 Feb 2007 |
Flat 5, 17 Leyland Street, Onekawa, Napier, 4110 | Registered & service | 23 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rupert Graham Neale
Bay View, Napier, 4104
Address used since 08 Nov 2021
Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 18 May 2011 |
Director | 02 Feb 2007 - current |
Warren Heath
Onekawa, Napier, 4110
Address used since 02 Feb 2007 |
Director | 02 Feb 2007 - 18 May 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
36 Leyland Street, Onekawa, Napier, 4110 | Registered & service | 02 Feb 2007 - 23 Nov 2023 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Neale, Paula Louise Individual |
Bay View Napier 4104 |
20 May 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Neale, Rupert Graham Individual |
Bay View Napier 4104 |
02 Feb 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heath, Warren Individual |
Onekawa Napier, New Zealand |
02 Feb 2007 - 20 May 2011 |
The New Zealand Deerstalkers Association, Napier Branch Incorporated 29 Thorn Place |
|
Eclypse Solutions 4 Schools Limited 6a Holden Street |
|
Bay City Cheerleaders Limited 25 Leyland Street |
|
Elevate Studios Limited 25 Leyland Street |
|
Hawkes Bay All Stars Incorporated 25 Leyland Street |
|
Thorn Place Motor Group Limited 23 Thorn Place |