C & S Properties (2006) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429033680033) was incorporated on 03 Jan 2007. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 162 Dee Street, Invercargill (type: physical, registered). 400 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 200 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Sinclair, Debbie (an individual) located at C/-18 Kakapo Street, Waikiwi postcode 9810. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Sinclair, Debbie (an individual) - located at C/-18 Kakapo Street, Waikiwi. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued C & S Properties (2006) Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
162 Dee Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered & service | 03 Jan 2007 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glenn James Sinclair
Waikiwi, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 14 Oct 2020
Winton, Winton, 9720
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 03 Jan 2007 - current |
Ross Andrew Cottier
Rd 2, Lake Hawea, 9382
Address used since 14 Oct 2020
Rd 2, Lumsden, 9792
Address used since 04 Feb 2010 |
Director | 03 Jan 2007 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Lyall James Sinclair
Winton, Winton, 9720
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 03 Jan 2007 - 19 Feb 2016 |
Kelvin Lyall Sinclair
Winton, Winton, 9720
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 03 Jan 2007 - 19 Feb 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sinclair, Debbie Individual |
C/-18 Kakapo Street Waikiwi 9810 |
27 Jan 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sinclair, Debbie Individual |
C/-18 Kakapo Street Waikiwi 9810 |
27 Jan 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Slee, Maxwell Clifford Individual |
Family Trust 104 Mararoa Road, The Key, Te Anau |
03 Jan 2007 - 09 Dec 2016 |
Cottier, Ross Andrew Individual |
851 Kane Road, Lake Hawea, Wanaka 9382 |
03 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2023 |
Cottier, Toni Monique Individual |
C/-851 Kane Road Lake Hawea, Wanaka 9382 |
03 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2023 |
Sinclair, Fay Thelma Individual |
Family Trust 109 Great North Road, Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 09 Dec 2016 |
Sinclair, Glenn James Individual |
C/-109 Great North Road Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 22 Dec 2015 |
Sinclair, Kelvin Lyall Individual |
C/-109 Great North Road Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 27 Jan 2017 |
Cottier, Richard Francis Individual |
C/-96a Wansbeck Street, Holmes Hill Oamaru 9401 |
03 Jan 2007 - 16 Oct 2023 |
Sinclair, Glenn James Individual |
C/-18 Kakapo Street Waikiwi 9810 |
03 Jan 2007 - 22 Dec 2015 |
Sinclair, Kelvin Lyall Individual |
C/-109 Great North Road Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 27 Jan 2017 |
Sinclair, Simone Kelly Individual |
C/-109 Great North Road Winton |
03 Aug 2009 - 09 Dec 2016 |
Price, Corey Robert Individual |
C/- 109 Great North Road Winton 9720 |
22 Dec 2015 - 09 Dec 2016 |
Sinclair, Glenn James Individual |
C/-109 Great North Road Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 22 Dec 2015 |
Sinclair, Lyall James Individual |
Family Trust 109 Great North Road, Winton |
03 Jan 2007 - 09 Dec 2016 |
J & R Ferguson Limited 162 Dee Street |
|
Hard Antler Property Limited 162 Dee Street |
|
Kensington Consulting Limited 162 Dee Street |
|
Greenfield Lease Limited Level 1 |
|
Lone Hill Limited Level 1 |
|
Kindley Downs Limited Level 1 |
G N Watkins Limited Level One |
Coral Coast Developments Limited Halfmoon Bay |
Pacific Tristar Limited Level 1 |
The Blue Hole Trustee Company Limited Level 1 |
Rothbury Capital Trust Limited Suite 1, 36 Kelvin Street |
Heartland Capital Trust Limited Suite 1, 36 Kelvin Street |