Pukeama Farm Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033688824) was incorporated on 14 Dec 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1168 Amohia Street, Rotorua, 3010 (type: registered, physical). 1168 Amohia Street, Rotorua had been their physical address, up to 04 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Snell, Jacqueline Christine Eleanor (an individual) located at Rd 5, Rotorua postcode 3076. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99 per cent of all shares (exactly 99 shares); it includes
Snell, Anthony John Sturges (an individual) - located at Rd 5, Rotorua. Our information was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1168 Amohia Street, Rotorua, 3010 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jacqueline Christine Eleanor Snell
Rd 5, Rotorua, 3076
Address used since 01 Jan 2016 |
Director | 14 Dec 2006 - current |
Anthony John Sturges Snell
Rd 5, Rotorua, 3076
Address used since 01 Jan 2016 |
Director | 14 Dec 2006 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1168 Amohia Street, Rotorua, 3010 | Physical & registered | 31 Aug 2018 - 04 Sep 2020 |
78 Ru Collin Road, Rd 4, Hastings, 4174 | Registered & physical | 27 Nov 2014 - 31 Aug 2018 |
Level One, Anz Bank Building, Porter Drive, Havelock North, 4157 | Registered & physical | 05 Jun 2013 - 27 Nov 2014 |
Whk, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings | Registered & physical | 01 Apr 2010 - 05 Jun 2013 |
Whk Coffey Davidson, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2007 - 01 Apr 2010 |
Coffey Davidson, 303n Karamu Road, Hastings | Registered & physical | 14 Dec 2006 - 01 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Snell, Jacqueline Christine Eleanor Individual |
Rd 5 Rotorua 3076 |
14 Dec 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Snell, Anthony John Sturges Individual |
Rd 5 Rotorua 3076 |
14 Dec 2006 - current |
Mca Consulting Limited 78 Ru Collin Road |
|
Gleneagles Properties Limited 77 Ru Collin Road |
|
Stm (new Zealand) Limited 111 Ru Collin Road |
|
Ithica (nz) Limited 116 Ru Collin Road |
|
Top Stock International Limited 116 Ru Collin Road |
|
Motorgear Limited 241 Mangaroa Road |