Movenpick Takapuna Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033897455) was registered on 01 Sep 2006. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (type: postal, physical). 33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 14 Nov 2019. Movenpick Takapuna Limited used other aliases, namely: Full Belly Enterprises Limited from 01 Sep 2006 to 25 Jan 2022. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Lewthwaite, Melinda (an individual) located at Campbells Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. "Ice cream retailing" (ANZSIC H451235) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Movenpick Takapuna Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Delivery | 04 Sep 2019 |
6d Channel View Road, Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Nov 2019 |
33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Postal | 06 Sep 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Melinda Lewthwaite
Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 15 Dec 2015 |
Director | 01 Sep 2006 - current |
33-45 Hurstmere Road , Takapuna , Auckland , 0622 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Registered & physical | 11 Sep 2014 - 14 Nov 2019 |
1 Saunders Place, Avondale, Auckland, 1026 | Registered | 14 Sep 2011 - 11 Sep 2014 |
44 Sylvan Avenue, Northcote, North Shore City, 0627 | Registered | 01 Oct 2010 - 14 Sep 2011 |
33-45 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, North Shore City, 0622 | Physical | 01 Oct 2010 - 11 Sep 2014 |
Level 1, 61 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, North Shore City 0622 | Registered | 18 Jun 2008 - 01 Oct 2010 |
Level 1, 61 Hurstmere Rd, Takapuna, North Shore City 0622 | Physical | 18 Jun 2008 - 01 Oct 2010 |
14 Omana Road, Milford, North Shore City, 0620 | Registered & physical | 01 Sep 2006 - 18 Jun 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lewthwaite, Melinda Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
06 Sep 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wiltshire, Melinda Director |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
26 Jan 2011 - 06 Sep 2022 |
Wiltshire, Melinda Individual |
Milford North Shore City, 0620 |
01 Sep 2006 - 07 Apr 2008 |
Wiltshire, Melinda Director |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
26 Jan 2011 - 06 Sep 2022 |
Lewthwaite, Jason David Individual |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0630 |
30 Mar 2016 - 05 Jan 2022 |
Wiltshire, Ben Individual |
Milford North Shore City 0620 |
09 Jan 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Null - Toorak Trust Other |
07 Apr 2008 - 26 Jan 2011 | |
Toorak Trust Other |
07 Apr 2008 - 26 Jan 2011 |
Pgh Shareplan Trustee Limited Level 1 |
|
Bian Takapuna Limited 33-45 Hurstmere Road |
|
Partners Group Nominee Limited Level One |
|
Dovan Properties Limited 30 Hurstmere Road |
|
Quadrant Systems Limited 30 Hurstmere Road |
|
Circuit Graphix Limited 30 Hurstmere Road |
East.t Sweet Limited 102 Archers Road |
New Start Trade Co., Limited 77 Birkenhead Avenue |
The Dessert Depot Limited 6d Channel View Road |
Himani Enterprise Limited 16 Vauxhall Road |
Blue Penguin Limited Unit 1, 70 Seaview Road |
Snowman Limited 107a,18 Courthouse Lane |