Dtr Trustee Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429033933788) was registered on 11 Aug 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 83B Ingram Road, Rd 3, Drury, 2579 (type: physical, registered). 83B Ingram Road, Rd 3, Drury had been their physical address, until 20 Jun 2017. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Drk Trustees Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Rd 3, Drury postcode 2579. Our information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
83b Ingram Road, Rd 3, Drury, 2579 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Jun 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Duthie
Rd 1, Waiuku, 2681
Address used since 11 Jun 2010
Rd 3, Drury, 2579
Address used since 11 Jun 2010 |
Director | 11 Aug 2006 - current |
Kirsten Taylor-ruiterman
Rd 3, Drury, 2579
Address used since 11 Jun 2010 |
Director | 11 Aug 2006 - current |
Sarah Ann Baber
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 01 Apr 2018 |
Director | 01 Apr 2018 - current |
Wayne Michael Kingham
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 10 Jul 2013 |
Director | 12 May 2011 - 10 Feb 2022 |
Eleanor Hans
Rd 4, Tuakau, 2694
Address used since 12 May 2011
Rd 4, Tuakau, 2694
Address used since 12 May 2011 |
Director | 12 May 2011 - 10 Feb 2022 |
Kirsten Jane Taylor-ruiterman
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 11 Jun 2010 |
Director | 11 Aug 2006 - 31 May 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
83b Ingram Road, Rd 3, Drury, 2579 | Physical & registered | 21 Jun 2012 - 20 Jun 2017 |
Drk Chartered Accountants Ltd, 83b Ingram Road, R D 3, Drury 2579 | Registered | 15 Jun 2009 - 21 Jun 2012 |
C/-drk Chartered Accountants Ltd, 83b Ingram Road, R D 3, Drury 2579 | Physical | 15 Jun 2009 - 21 Jun 2012 |
C/-duthie Taylor-ruiterman, Chartered Accountants, 83b Ingram Road, R D 3, Drury, 2579 | Registered & physical | 11 Aug 2006 - 15 Jun 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Drk Trustees Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050085347 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 3 Drury 2579 |
19 May 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Duthie, Craig Individual |
Rd 1 Glenbrook 2681 |
11 Aug 2006 - 19 May 2022 |
Taylor-ruiterman, Kirsten Individual |
Pukekohe 2120 |
11 Aug 2006 - 19 May 2022 |
Norica Limited 83b Ingram Road |
|
P E Welding NZ Limited 83b Ingram Road |
|
Ket Investments Limited 83b Ingram Road |
|
Rnr Hireage Limited 83b Ingram Road |
|
You Name It Limited 83b Ingram Road |
|
C D I Limited 83b Ingram Road |