Plimmer & Co Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034102114) was started on 01 Jun 2006. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 354 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: delivery, registered). Suite 1, Queens Wharf Offices, i Queens Wharf, Wellington had been their registered address, up until 01 Aug 2022. Plimmer & Co Limited used more names, namely: Motukawa Holdings Limited from 01 Jun 2006 to 19 Jun 2020. 1200 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 300 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Motukawa Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. Our information was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, Queens Wharf Offices, I Queens Wharf, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery | 18 Feb 2020 |
Level 5, 354 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 01 Aug 2022 |
Level 5, 354 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery | 07 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hamish James Plimmer
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Jun 2006 |
Director | 01 Jun 2006 - current |
Simon Clifford Plimmer
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 18 May 2022
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 26 Apr 2017 |
Director | 16 Oct 2013 - current |
Sally Jane Fox
Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 06 Dec 2017
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 16 Oct 2013 |
Director | 16 Oct 2013 - current |
Warren James Plimmer
R D 3, Taihape 4793,
Address used since 23 Sep 2009 |
Director | 01 Jun 2006 - 11 Oct 2014 |
Judith Anne Plimmer
R D 3, Taihape 4793,
Address used since 23 Sep 2009 |
Director | 01 Jun 2006 - 11 Oct 2014 |
Suite 1, Queens Wharf Offices , I Queens Wharf , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, Queens Wharf Offices, I Queens Wharf, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 26 Oct 2018 - 01 Aug 2022 |
53-55 Manchester Street, Feilding, 4702 | Registered & physical | 30 Sep 2009 - 26 Oct 2018 |
C/-allanmcneill, Chartered Accountants, 53-55 Manchester Street, Feilding | Registered & physical | 01 Jun 2006 - 30 Sep 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Motukawa Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034129968 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
01 Jun 2006 - current |
Robinsons Veterinary Services Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Grassmere Dairy Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Kamind Properties Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Mark Duncan Livestock Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
|
Focal Point Hastings Limited 53- 55 Manchester Street |
|
Kensington Investments Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |