Net Alarms Limited (issued a business number of 9429034161609) was registered on 05 May 2006. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Po Box 260028, Howick East, Auckland, 2146 (type: postal, physical). 4A Bemrose Place, Cockle Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 17 Feb 2021. Net Alarms Limited used other aliases, namely: Hots Enterprises Limited from 05 May 2006 to 02 Feb 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Butcher, Sarah Leigh (an individual) located at Cockle Bay, Auckland postcode 2014. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Butcher, Gareth Daniel (an individual) - located at Cockle Bay, Auckland. "Wholesaling, all products (excluding storage and handling of goods)" (ANZSIC F373980) is the category the ABS issued Net Alarms Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 260028, Howick East, Auckland, 2146 | Postal | 02 Feb 2021 |
15 Ron Driver Place, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 17 Feb 2021 |
15 Ron Driver Place, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Service & physical | 14 Feb 2022 |
Po Box 260028, Howick East, Auckland, 2146 | Postal | 05 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gareth Daniel Butcher
Cockle Bay, Manukau, 2014
Address used since 05 Feb 2010 |
Director | 05 May 2006 - current |
Sarah Leigh Butcher
Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 02 Nov 2012 |
Director | 02 Nov 2012 - current |
Stephen Daniel Crowe
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 15 Feb 2013 |
Director | 05 May 2006 - 02 Nov 2012 |
Henry Ping-kei Luk
Lower Hutt Wellington,
Address used since 05 May 2006 |
Director | 05 May 2006 - 31 Mar 2009 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Po Box 260028, Howick East, Auckland, 2146 | Postal | 05 Feb 2024 |
15 Ron Driver Place , East Tamaki , Auckland , 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4a Bemrose Place, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Registered | 10 Jul 2013 - 17 Feb 2021 |
4a Bemrose Place, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Physical | 10 Jul 2013 - 14 Feb 2022 |
Level 2, 3 Arawa Street, Khyber Pass, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 14 Feb 2011 - 10 Jul 2013 |
Level 1, 52-54 Grafton Road, Grafton | Registered & physical | 12 Feb 2010 - 14 Feb 2011 |
4a Bemrose Place, Howick Auckland | Registered & physical | 05 May 2006 - 12 Feb 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Butcher, Sarah Leigh Individual |
Cockle Bay Auckland 2014 |
02 Jul 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Butcher, Gareth Daniel Individual |
Cockle Bay Auckland 2014 |
05 May 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luk, Henry Ping-kei Individual |
Lower Hutt Wellington |
05 May 2006 - 05 May 2006 |
Crowe, Stephen Daniel Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
05 May 2006 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Raihmac Enterprises Limited 9 Bemrose Place |
|
Burgers Limited 2/6 Bert Wilson Place |
|
Allan Building Limited 17 Bert Wilson Place |
|
Forbiz Investments Limited 17 Bemrose Place |
|
Ghoshals Limited 7 Bert Wilson Place |
|
Tremlett Associates Limited 32 Bert Wilson Place |
J.a.r Trading & Recycling Limited 27 Colmar Road |
Cheng Trading Limited 101 Hutchinsons Road |
Cemson Group Company Limited 44 Casuarina Road |
Unic International (nz) Limited 41 Cornelian Crescent |
J.k. Best International Trade Limited 175q Harris Road |
One Stop Pak Limited 2 Willow Way |