Tour & Travel Coach Company Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034190999) was started on 06 Apr 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 62 Aurea Avenue, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 (type: registered, physical). 33 Hatherlow Street, Glenfield, Auckland had been their physical address, until 17 May 2017. Tour & Travel Coach Company Limited used more names, namely: Kiwi Miracle Limited from 06 Apr 2006 to 22 Jun 2007. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Zou, Jin (an individual) located at Pakuranga, Auckland postcode 2010. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Huang, Xiaoyu (an individual) - located at Pakuranga, Auckland. "Scenic and sightseeing transport (excluding aviation)" (business classification I501060) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Tour & Travel Coach Company Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
62 Aurea Avenue, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical & service | 17 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jin Zou
Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 09 May 2017
Glenfield, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 01 Apr 2014 |
Director | 06 Apr 2006 - current |
Lucia Li
Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Address used since 07 May 2008 |
Director | 07 May 2008 - 13 Feb 2009 |
62 Aurea Avenue , Pakuranga , Auckland , 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33 Hatherlow Street, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 | Physical & registered | 09 Apr 2014 - 17 May 2017 |
8h/18 Wakefield Street, Auckland Central, Auckland | Registered & physical | 03 Sep 2007 - 09 Apr 2014 |
139 Peary Road, Mt. Eden, Auckland, New Zealand | Physical & registered | 30 Jul 2007 - 03 Sep 2007 |
8h/18 Wakefield Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, New Zealand | Physical & registered | 06 Apr 2006 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zou, Jin Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 |
14 Nov 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Huang, Xiaoyu Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 |
28 Apr 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Lucia Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland |
14 May 2009 - 14 May 2009 |
Huang, Xiaoyu Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
28 Apr 2011 - 28 Apr 2011 |
Zou, Jin Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland, New Zealand |
06 Apr 2006 - 01 Aug 2007 |
Li, Lucia Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland |
23 Apr 2008 - 23 Apr 2008 |
Kwikserv Scaffolding Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035762508 Company Number: 1400001 Entity |
14 Nov 2007 - 14 Nov 2007 | |
Kwikserv Scaffolding Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035762508 Company Number: 1400001 Entity |
14 Nov 2007 - 14 Nov 2007 |
Fanraco Trustee Limited 62 Aurea Avenue |
|
Greg Lewis Plumbing Limited 56 Aurea Avenue |
|
Akev Limited 33 Aurea Avenue |
|
Make Cafe 4u Limited 29 Aurea Avenue |
|
Surti Indian Samosa Limited 13 Swan Crescent |
|
Pixeldepth Limited 11 Swan Crescent |
Action Tours Limited 31 Arnold Street |
Auckland Sea Shuttles Limited 45 Hauraki Road |
Kiko Management Limited 9 Kanuka Way |
Zk-ynz Limited 328 Pollen Street |
Glass Bottom Boat Whitianga Limited 16 Monk Street |
New Zealand Craft Beer Tours Limited 219c Minden Road |