Kr Dairies Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034322116) was registered on 31 Jan 2006. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 45-49 Tirau Street, Putaruru (type: physical, registered). Kr Dairies Limited used other aliases, namely: Forest Farm (2006) Limited from 31 Jan 2006 to 28 Nov 2013. 1200 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 1200 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Korsten, Marcellinus Cornelis Leonardus (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tokoroa postcode 3491,
Raemaekers, Bianca Dorathea Maria (an individual) located at Rd 1, Tokoroa postcode 3491. Our data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
45-49 Tirau Street, Putaruru | Physical & registered & service | 31 Jan 2006 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Marcellinus Cornelis Leonardus Korsten
Rd 1, Tokoroa, 3491
Address used since 20 Sep 2022
Rd 1, Tokoroa, 3491
Address used since 04 Mar 2010 |
Director | 31 Jan 2006 - current |
Bianca Dorothea Maria Raemakers
Rd 1, Tokoroa, 3491
Address used since 20 Sep 2022
Rd 1, Tokoroa, 3491
Address used since 04 Mar 2010 |
Director | 28 Apr 2006 - current |
Frank Walter Appleton
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Mar 2011 |
Director | 31 Jan 2006 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Doreen Mary Appleton
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 01 May 2013 |
Director | 01 May 2013 - 26 Nov 2013 |
Mark Peter Johnston
Rd 7, Rotorua, 3097
Address used since 04 Nov 2011 |
Director | 04 Nov 2011 - 01 May 2013 |
Doreen May Appleton
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 02 Mar 2011 |
Director | 28 Apr 2006 - 04 Nov 2011 |
David Stewart Graham
Waotu, Putaruru,
Address used since 31 Jan 2006 |
Director | 31 Jan 2006 - 30 Apr 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Korsten, Marcellinus Cornelis Leonardus Individual |
Rd 1 Tokoroa 3491 |
31 Jan 2006 - current |
Raemaekers, Bianca Dorathea Maria Individual |
Rd 1 Tokoroa 3491 |
31 Jan 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Appleton, Doreen Mary Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
31 Jan 2006 - 28 Nov 2013 |
Needham, Rodney Arthur Individual |
52 Canada Street Morrinsville |
31 Jan 2006 - 28 Nov 2013 |
Brown, Rosalind Boyd Elliot Individual |
Waotu Putaruru |
31 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Appleton, Frank Walter Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
31 Jan 2006 - 28 Nov 2013 |
Graham, David Stewart Individual |
Waotu Putaruru |
31 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Gray, Richard Carlyle Individual |
15 Albert Park Drive Te Awamutu |
31 Jan 2006 - 31 Jan 2006 |
F T P Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Over The Moon Dairy Company Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Red Dog Dairies Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
South Pro Woodlands Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Twin Creeks Dairy Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |
|
Beaver Contracting Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |