Civiltec New Zealand Limited (NZBN 9429034328798) was launched on 03 Feb 2006. 1 address is in use by the company: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings had been their physical address, up to 24 Sep 2019. 60 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 30 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Richard Gruiters (an individual) located at Havelock North postcode 4130. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 30 shares); it includes
Paula Gruiters (an individual) - located at Havelock North. Businesscheck's database was updated on 27 Jan 2020.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 24 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Reta Gruiters
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 25 Mar 2011 |
Director | 03 Feb 2006 - current |
Richard John Gruiters
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 25 Mar 2011 |
Director | 03 Feb 2006 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 23 Feb 2018 - 24 Sep 2019 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 23 Oct 2014 - 23 Feb 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 30 Aug 2013 - 23 Feb 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 04 Apr 2011 - 23 Oct 2014 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 04 Apr 2011 - 30 Aug 2013 |
Whk, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings | Physical & registered | 09 Apr 2010 - 04 Apr 2011 |
Whk Coffey Davidson, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings | Physical & registered | 01 Aug 2007 - 09 Apr 2010 |
Coffey Davidson Limited, 303n Karamu Road, Hastings | Physical & registered | 03 Feb 2006 - 01 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard John Gruiters Individual |
Havelock North 4130 |
03 Feb 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Reta Gruiters Individual |
Havelock North 4130 |
03 Feb 2006 - current |
Black Folder Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Poukawa Holdings Limited 211 Market Street |
|
David Brownrigg Investments Limited Farming House |
|
Farming House Limited 211 Market Street South |
|
Kiwiwines2u Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Brownrigg Agriculture Limited 211 Market Street South |