Canterbury Metalwork 2006 Limited (NZBN 9429034333587) was launched on 27 Jan 2006. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: Po Box 28142, Beckenham, Christchurch, 8242 (type: postal, registered). 220 Annex Road, Middleton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 01 May 2017. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (1% of shares), namely:
Thorburn, Darryl Bruce (an individual) located at Huntsbury, Christchurch postcode 8022. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Norris, Joanne Elizabeth (an individual) - located at Huntsbury, Christchurch. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (98 shares, 98%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Norris, Joanne Elizabeth, located at Christchurch (an individual),
La Hood Allen Trustees Limited, located at Level 1, 205 Princes Street, Dunedin (an entity),
Thorburn, Darryl Bruce, located at Christchurch, Christchurch (an individual). "Fabricated structural steel mfg - ready made parts for structures" (ANZSIC C222110) is the category the ABS issued to Canterbury Metalwork 2006 Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Commerce Crescent, Islington, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered & service | 01 May 2017 |
Po Box 28142, Beckenham, Christchurch, 8242 | Postal | 09 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Darryl Bruce Thorburn
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 17 Jan 2010 |
Director | 27 Jan 2006 - current |
12 Commerce Crescent , Islington , Christchurch , 8042 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
220 Annex Road, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 18 Apr 2011 - 01 May 2017 |
73 Coleridge St, Sydenham, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 22 Jan 2010 - 18 Apr 2011 |
118a Centaurus Road, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 21 Mar 2007 - 22 Jan 2010 |
24 Patmos Place, Mt Pleasant, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 27 Jan 2006 - 21 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thorburn, Darryl Bruce Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
09 Feb 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Norris, Joanne Elizabeth Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
09 Feb 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Norris, Joanne Elizabeth Individual |
Christchurch |
09 Feb 2006 - current |
La Hood Allen Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036459643 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Level 1, 205 Princes Street Dunedin 9016 |
09 Feb 2006 - current |
Thorburn, Darryl Bruce Individual |
Christchurch Christchurch 8022 |
09 Feb 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thorburn, Darryl Bruce Individual |
Mt Pleasant Christchurch |
27 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Cml Leasing Limited 12 Commerce Crescent |
|
Swimming Canterbury West Coast Charitable Trust 22 B Mortlake Street |
|
Amplifyou Limited 6a Brixton Street |
|
Marist Albion Netball Club Incorporated 352 Waterloo Road |
|
Grounds & Services Properties Limited 869 Halswell Junction Road |
|
Independent Forklift Leasing Limited 33h Foremans Road |
Christchurch Steel (1995) Limited Level 1 |
Taurus Engineering Limited 19 Taurus Place |
Sks Fabrication Limited 369 High Street |
Fitzgerald Steel Limited 26 Canon Street |
Aniseed Engineering Limited 120 Aniseed Valley Road |
Alchemy Engineering Design Limited 32 Cedarwood Street |