Accomplish Vocational Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034350287) was launched on 25 Jan 2006. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 127 Harold Holt Avenue, Pirimai, Napier, 4112 (type: registered, service). 43 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier had been their physical address, until 04 Nov 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Rewi, Paula Teraiwa (an individual) located at Napier,
Hill, Christopher Sinclair (an individual) located at Pirimai, Napier 4110,
Rewi, Bronwyn Ani (an individual) located at Pirimai, Napier 4110. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Rewi, Paula Teraiwa (an individual) - located at Napier. Our data was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Black & White Accounting Limited, 43 Carlyle Street, Napier, 4110 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 21 Dec 2010 |
Black & White Accounting Limited, 5 Carlyle Street, Napier, 4110 | Shareregister & other (Address For Share Register) | 27 Oct 2022 |
5 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Nov 2022 |
127 Harold Holt Avenue, Pirimai, Napier, 4112 | Registered & service | 28 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Teraiwa Rewi
Pirimai, Napier, 4112
Address used since 20 Oct 2015 |
Director | 08 Sep 2006 - current |
Leanne Matheson
Maketu, Tauranga,
Address used since 08 Sep 2006 |
Director | 08 Sep 2006 - 29 Apr 2013 |
Janine Rochelle Pohe
St Leonards, Hastings,
Address used since 25 Jan 2006 |
Director | 25 Jan 2006 - 08 Sep 2006 |
Scott James Burden
St Leonards, Hastings,
Address used since 25 Jan 2006 |
Director | 25 Jan 2006 - 08 Sep 2006 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
127 Harold Holt Avenue, Pirimai, Napier, 4112 | Registered & service | 28 Mar 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
43 Carlyle Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Physical & registered | 07 Jan 2011 - 04 Nov 2022 |
Maxims Accounting Ltd, Cnr Austin St & Cadbury Rd, Onekawa, Napier | Registered & physical | 07 Oct 2009 - 07 Jan 2011 |
Pene Johnstone Accounting, Cnr Austin Street & Cadbury Street, Onekawa, Napier | Physical & registered | 19 Sep 2006 - 07 Oct 2009 |
200 Lovedale Road, St Leonards, Hastings | Registered & physical | 25 Jan 2006 - 19 Sep 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rewi, Paula Teraiwa Individual |
Napier |
14 Sep 2006 - current |
Hill, Christopher Sinclair Individual |
Pirimai Napier 4110 |
11 May 2010 - current |
Rewi, Bronwyn Ani Individual |
Pirimai Napier 4110 |
11 May 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rewi, Paula Teraiwa Individual |
Napier |
14 Sep 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burden, Scott James Individual |
St Leonards Hastings |
25 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Matheson, Leanne Individual |
Maketu Tauranga |
14 Sep 2006 - 05 Apr 2013 |
O'neale Trustee Company (2006) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034390047 Company Number: 1744525 Entity |
03 May 2010 - 05 Apr 2013 | |
Parenting Now Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035227564 Company Number: 1546474 Entity |
25 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Parenting Now Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035227564 Company Number: 1546474 Entity |
25 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
O'neale Trustee Company (2006) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034390047 Company Number: 1744525 Entity |
03 May 2010 - 05 Apr 2013 | |
Pohe, Janine Rochelle Individual |
St Leonards Hastings |
25 Jan 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
The Huddy Beakle Company Limited 43 Carlyle St |
|
Animal Innovations Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Helidrill Services Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Zoido Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Approved Car Finance Limited 43 Carlyle Street |
|
Place Real Estate Limited 43 Carlyle Street |