Nz Scenic Tours Limited (NZBN 9429034483909) was registered on 19 Oct 2005. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 68 Street Queen, Cambridge, 3434 (type: physical, registered). 177 Victoria Street, Cambridge had been their physical address, up to 04 Dec 2014. Nz Scenic Tours Limited used other names, namely: Matai-Awa Investments Limited from 19 Oct 2005 to 05 Mar 2014. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Lois Kilgour (an individual) located at Cambridge postcode 3434. Businesscheck's database was updated on 07 Jan 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
68 Queen Street, Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434 | Other (Address For Share Register) (Address For Share Register) | 28 Nov 2013 |
68 Street Queen, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered | 06 Dec 2013 |
68 Street Queen, Cambridge, 3434 | Physical | 04 Dec 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lois Margaret Kilgour
Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 28 Nov 2013 |
Director | 19 Oct 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
177 Victoria Street, Cambridge, 3434 | Physical | 06 Dec 2013 - 04 Dec 2014 |
177 Victoria Street, Cambridge, 3434 | Registered | 11 Dec 2012 - 06 Dec 2013 |
26 Duke Street, Cambridge | Physical | 04 Mar 2008 - 06 Dec 2013 |
26 Duke Street, Cambridge | Registered | 04 Mar 2008 - 11 Dec 2012 |
113 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau | Physical & registered | 19 Oct 2005 - 04 Mar 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lois Margaret Kilgour Individual |
Cambridge 3434 |
19 Oct 2005 - current |
Kerb Solutions Limited 68 Queen Street |
|
Burgled NZ Limited 68 Queen Street |
|
Harbour Investments Limited 68 Queen Street |
|
Eastern Pacific Trading Limited 68 Queen Street |
|
Boyle Gordon Research Limited 68 Queen Street |
|
C&t Rural Delivery Limited 68 Queen Street |