Summit Marketing (2005) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034584286) was started on 15 Sep 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 115 Sherborne Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, physical). 14 Highcrest Heights, Westmorland, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 30 Aug 2016. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 35 shares (35% of shares), namely:
Beaven, Andrew John (an individual) located at Westmorland, Christchurch postcode 8025,
Davies, James Christopher (an individual) located at Ostend, Waiheke Island postcode 1081,
Beaven, Kay Elizabeth (an individual) located at Westmorland, Christchurch postcode 8025. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 45% of all shares (exactly 45 shares); it includes
Smith, Mark Findlay (an individual) - located at Loburn Rd2, Rangiora. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (20 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Beaven, Andrew John, located at Westmoreland, Christchurch (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
115 Sherborne Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Aug 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew John Beaven
Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 01 Nov 2021
Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 04 Sep 2008 |
Director | 08 Sep 2006 - current |
Mark Findlay Smith
Loburn Rd2, Rangiora,
Address used since 15 Sep 2005 |
Director | 15 Sep 2005 - 29 Nov 2007 |
Maria Titia Georgina Roberts
Avonside, Christchurch,
Address used since 08 Sep 2006 |
Director | 08 Sep 2006 - 03 Nov 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14 Highcrest Heights, Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 | Physical & registered | 09 Aug 2011 - 30 Aug 2016 |
Level 4, 199-201 Cashel Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 16 Apr 2008 - 09 Aug 2011 |
Level 3, 183 Hereford Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 25 Jul 2006 - 16 Apr 2008 |
Ael Building, Level 2 Suite 6, 199-201 Cashel Strett, Christchurch | Physical | 07 Feb 2006 - 25 Jul 2006 |
Ael Building, Level 2 Suite 6, 199 -2001 Cashel Street, Christchurch | Registered | 07 Feb 2006 - 07 Feb 2006 |
Level 1,151 Worcester Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 15 Sep 2005 - 07 Feb 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beaven, Andrew John Individual |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 |
08 Sep 2006 - current |
Davies, James Christopher Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1081 |
24 Jul 2017 - current |
Beaven, Kay Elizabeth Individual |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 |
08 Sep 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Mark Findlay Individual |
Loburn Rd2 Rangiora |
15 Sep 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beaven, Andrew John Individual |
Westmoreland Christchurch |
08 Sep 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Akuhata-brown, Henare Individual |
Corsair Bay Christchurch |
08 Sep 2006 - 06 Nov 2006 |
Butler, Teresa Individual |
Christchurch |
20 Feb 2006 - 20 Feb 2006 |
Butler, Teresa Individual |
Christchurch |
20 Feb 2006 - 20 Feb 2006 |
Saunders, Geoffrey Childers Individual |
Christchurch |
08 Sep 2006 - 24 Jul 2017 |
Coo Coo Limited 115 Sherborne Street |
|
Wdc 03 Limited 115 Sherborne Street |
|
In The Hood Limited 115 Sherborne Street |
|
Kiwi Bloodstock Limited 115 Sherborne Street |
|
High Street Living Limited 115 Sherborne Street |
|
Cold Form Steel Limited 115 Sherborne Street |