Clifton Investment Trust Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034586686) was registered on 30 Aug 2005. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 25 Mailer Street, Mornington, Dunedin, 9011 (type: registered, physical). 38 Amber Close, Queenstown had been their registered address, until 10 Apr 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Clifton, Ann Elizabeth (an individual) located at Queenstown. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Clifton, Philip Arthur (an individual) - located at Queenstown. Our database was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38 Amber Close, Queenstown | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 07 Apr 2009 |
25 Mailer Street, Mornington, Dunedin, 9011 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Arthur Clifton
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 22 Mar 2016 |
Director | 30 Aug 2005 - current |
Ann Elizabeth Clifton
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 22 Mar 2016 |
Director | 30 Aug 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
38 Amber Close, Queenstown | Registered & physical | 16 Apr 2009 - 10 Apr 2018 |
34b Mckinnon Terrace, Queenstown | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 2005 - 16 Apr 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clifton, Ann Elizabeth Individual |
Queenstown |
30 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clifton, Philip Arthur Individual |
Queenstown |
30 Aug 2005 - current |
Ross Management Dn Limited 25 Mailer Street |
|
And Hospitality Group Limited 25 Mailer Street, Mornington |
|
Mulder Industries Limited 25 Mailer Street |
|
Richard Templeton Contracting Limited 25 Mailer Street |
|
Hyvan Anaesthesia Limited 25 Mailer Street |
|
Cazemier Lifestyle Trustees Limited 25 Mailer Street |