Hnrb Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034703830) was launched on 15 Jun 2005. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 38 St Georges Road, Avondale, Auckland, 0600 (type: registered, other). Hnrb Investments Limited used other names, namely: Drb2 T/A Super Saver Foodmart Limited from 15 Jun 2005 to 14 Mar 2019. 10 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 4 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
Singh, Hardip (a director) located at Avondale, Auckland postcode 0600. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40 per cent of all shares (4 shares); it includes
Devi, Nirmala (an individual) - located at Avondale, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (2 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Teja, Balvindar Singh, located at Avondale, Auckland (an individual). "Grocery retailing" (business classification G411030) is the classification the ABS issued Hnrb Investments Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38 St Georges Road, Avondale, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Jun 2005 |
38 St Georges Rd, Avondale, Auckland | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 15 Jun 2005 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hardip Singh
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 27 Jul 2005 |
Director | 27 Jul 2005 - current |
Nirmala Devi
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 05 Aug 2016 |
Director | 05 Aug 2016 - current |
Daljit Singh
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 01 Dec 2011 |
Director | 01 Dec 2011 - 30 Nov 2013 |
Nirmala Devi
Avondale, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Jun 2005 |
Director | 15 Jun 2005 - 01 Aug 2005 |
38 St Georges Road , Avondale , Auckland , 0600 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Singh, Hardip Director |
Avondale Auckland 0600 |
05 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Devi, Nirmala Individual |
Avondale Auckland 0600 |
24 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teja, Balvindar Singh Individual |
Avondale Auckland 0600 |
05 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teja, Ravindar Singh Individual |
Avondale Auckland 0600 |
05 Aug 2016 - 01 Apr 2024 |
Devi, Nirmala Individual |
Avondale Auckland |
15 Jun 2005 - 23 Jul 2012 |
Singh, Daljit Individual |
Avondale Auckland 0600 |
23 Jul 2012 - 25 Aug 2015 |
Pan American Recordings Limited 23 St Georges Rd |
|
Oyanis Limited 36d Chalmers Street |
|
Sam's Motors Limited 5 St Jude Street |
|
Nzau Tyres Limited 5 St Jude Street |
|
Hee Sok Limited 4 St Georges Road |
|
Avondale Lawnmowers & Chainsaws (2012) Limited 2 St Georges Road |
Vraj Food Limited Unit 12, 2 Lansford Crescent |
The Taro Plantation Limited 13 Michael Foley Place |
Hongxing Asian Food Supplies Limited 3022 Great North Road |
Hinamit Foods Limited 123a Tiverton Road |
Sky Foods Limited 123a Tiverton Road |
Bhumika Trading Limited 210 Richardson Road |