Phil Cowan Sheetmetals Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034832554) was launched on 07 Apr 2005. 1 address is currently in use by the company: Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 (type: registered, physical). Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings had been their registered address, until 01 Nov 2019. 1000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 998 shares (99.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Philip Cowan (an individual) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130,
Michelle Cowan (an individual) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130,
Peter Maloney (an individual) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Philip Cowan (an individual) - located at Havelock North, Havelock North. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Michelle Cowan, located at Havelock North, Havelock North (an individual). Our information was last updated on 19 May 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle Terese Cowan
Parkvale, Hastings, 4130
Address used since 22 Sep 2009 |
Director | 07 Apr 2005 - current |
Philip Michael Cowan
Parkvale, Hastings, 4130
Address used since 22 Sep 2009 |
Director | 07 Apr 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2016 - 01 Nov 2019 |
Unit 3, Business Hq, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 09 Feb 2016 - 20 Sep 2016 |
313 Eastbourne Street West, Hastings | Physical & registered | 07 Apr 2005 - 09 Feb 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Michael Cowan Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
07 Apr 2005 - current |
Michelle Terese Cowan Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
07 Apr 2005 - current |
Peter Lawrence Maloney Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
21 Apr 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Michael Cowan Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
07 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle Terese Cowan Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
07 Apr 2005 - current |
Antara Group Limited Business Hq |
|
Centric Group Limited Business Hq |
|
Hbs Capital Limited Unit 3, Business Hq |
|
Doll House Properties Limited Business H Q |
|
The Clifton Reserve Society Incorporated Moore Stephens Markhams Hawkes Bay Ltd |
|
Anacott Farms Limited Partnership Moore Stephens Markhams |