Brl Patents Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034986325) was launched on 20 Jan 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 58 Gracefield Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, service). 38 Birmingham Drive Middleton, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 30 Mar 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Seismic Shift Limited (an entity) located at Middleton, Christchurch postcode 8013. "General engineering" (ANZSIC C249910) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Brl Patents Limited. Our data was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38 Birmingham Drive Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical | 26 May 2021 |
58 Gracefield Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & service | 30 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geoffrey Nigel Banks
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 10 Nov 2016 |
Director | 20 Jan 2005 - current |
Adam Francis Walker
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 13 Jun 2019 |
Director | 13 Jun 2019 - 11 Nov 2020 |
William James Lomax
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 07 Aug 2012 |
Director | 20 Jan 2005 - 12 Jun 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
38 Birmingham Drive Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & service | 26 May 2021 - 30 Mar 2023 |
248 Montreal Street, Christchurch, 8023 | Registered | 19 Oct 2020 - 26 May 2021 |
248 Montreal Street, Christchurch, 8023 | Physical | 14 Oct 2020 - 26 May 2021 |
5 Norwich Quay, Lyttelton, Christchurch, 8082 | Physical | 20 Oct 2015 - 14 Oct 2020 |
5 Norwich Quay, Lyttelton, Christchurch, 8082 | Registered | 20 Oct 2015 - 19 Oct 2020 |
219 Main South Road, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 20 Jan 2005 - 20 Oct 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Seismic Shift Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050635870 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Middleton Christchurch 8013 |
10 Oct 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Building Revolutions Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048393911 Company Number: 8038658 Entity |
24 Nov 2020 - 10 Oct 2022 | |
Duncan, Gordon Edward Individual |
Halswell Christchurch |
20 Jan 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Net 2018 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046614384 Company Number: 6728834 Entity |
13 Jun 2019 - 24 Nov 2020 | |
Newman, Andrew Joseph Individual |
New Brighton Christchurch |
20 Jan 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Net Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034260296 Company Number: 1780010 Entity |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 |
16 Aug 2006 - 13 Jun 2019 |
Building Revolutions Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048393911 Company Number: 8038658 Entity |
Christchurch 8013 |
24 Nov 2020 - 10 Oct 2022 |
Net 2018 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046614384 Company Number: 6728834 Entity |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 |
13 Jun 2019 - 24 Nov 2020 |
Lomax, William James Individual |
Lyttelton Christchurch |
20 Jan 2005 - 29 Jun 2006 |
Net Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034260296 Company Number: 1780010 Entity |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 |
16 Aug 2006 - 13 Jun 2019 |
Bf Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036211272 Company Number: 1261834 Entity |
29 Jun 2006 - 29 Jun 2006 | |
Bf Enterprises Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036211272 Company Number: 1261834 Entity |
29 Jun 2006 - 29 Jun 2006 | |
Banks, Geoffrey Nigel Individual |
Christchurch |
20 Jan 2005 - 29 Jun 2006 |
Lyttelton Harbour Cruises Limited 5 Norwich Quay |
|
Dolphin Experience Limited 5 Norwich Quay |
|
Black Cat Group 2007 Limited 5 Norwich Quay |
|
Studio2 Limited 5 Norwich Quay |
|
Pryde In The South Charitable Trust Lyttelton Medical Centre |
|
Glomco Limited 14 Norwich Quay |
Maintenance Management Services Limited 6 Harbour View Terrace |
Mcgregor Engineering Limited 208 Major Hornbrook Road |
Plant & Building Safety Limited 7 Ocean View Terrace |
Cutting Edge Engineering Limited 17 Monalua Avenue |
Eco Engineering Limited 8 Nayland Street |
Clemence Engineering Limited 24 Nuttall Drive |