Midlands Properties Wanaka Limited (NZBN 9429035068297) was launched on 24 Nov 2004. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 393-405 West Street, Ashburton, 7700 (type: records, registered). 54 Cass Street, Ashburton had been their registered address, up until 08 Mar 2023. Midlands Properties Wanaka Limited used other names, namely: Midlands Finance Limited from 24 Nov 2004 to 14 Apr 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (5% of shares), namely:
B J Davidson Investments Limited (an entity) located at Ashburton postcode 7700. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (200 shares); it includes
Flow Agriculture Limited (an entity) - located at Ashburton. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (300 shares, 30%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Duncan Storrier Investments Limited, located at Ashburton (an entity). Our information was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
54 Cass Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical | 20 Mar 2017 |
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Service & registered | 08 Mar 2023 |
393-405 West Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Records | 25 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Douglas Green
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 04 Mar 2010 |
Director | 24 Nov 2004 - current |
Eric Thomas Parr
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 25 Mar 2019
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 29 May 2018 |
Director | 29 May 2018 - current |
Andrew Richard Davidson
Rd 12, Methven, 7782
Address used since 28 Aug 2018 |
Director | 28 Aug 2018 - current |
Richard Giles Bowman
Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604
Address used since 04 Apr 2023 |
Director | 04 Apr 2023 - current |
Duncan Rex Storrier
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 07 Oct 2010 |
Director | 24 Nov 2004 - 13 May 2018 |
Brian John Davidson
Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 24 Nov 2004 |
Director | 24 Nov 2004 - 26 Jun 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
54 Cass Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Registered & service | 20 Mar 2017 - 08 Mar 2023 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Registered & physical | 05 Apr 2005 - 20 Mar 2017 |
Gabites Sinclair & Partners Limited, Chartered Accountants, 100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Registered & physical | 24 Nov 2004 - 05 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
B J Davidson Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037158972 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ashburton 7700 |
12 Jan 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Flow Agriculture Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030905924 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ashburton 7700 |
18 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Duncan Storrier Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031144636 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ashburton 7700 |
18 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
C Green Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035823063 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ashburton 7700 |
18 Sep 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Midlands Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038036415 Company Number: 867618 Entity |
Ashburton 7700 |
24 Nov 2004 - 18 Sep 2020 |
Midlands Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038036415 Company Number: 867618 Entity |
Ashburton 7700 |
24 Nov 2004 - 18 Sep 2020 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Midlands Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 867618 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
54 Cass Street Ashburton 7700 |
Ashburton Guardian Company Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Kiwicorp Products Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Chris Woods Contracting Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
A & J Lowe Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Rudge Holdings Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
V P Farming Limited 54 Cass Street |