Begovich Farms Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035072577) was incorporated on 30 Nov 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 (type: registered, physical). Cooper Aitken & Partners Ltd, 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville had been their physical address, up to 01 Sep 2011. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Ca Trustees (M & J Begovich) Limited (an entity) located at Morrinsville, Null postcode 3300,
Begovich, Mark Allan (an individual) located at Rd 1, Morrinsville postcode 3371,
Begovich, Judith Susan (an individual) located at Rd 1, Morrinsville postcode 3371. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Begovich, Judith Susan (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Morrinsville. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Begovich, Mark Allan, located at Rd 1, Morrinsville (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville, 3300 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Sep 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Allan Begovich
Rd 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 26 Sep 2017
Rd 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 27 Sep 2019 |
Director | 30 Nov 2004 - current |
Judith Susan Begovich
Rd 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 26 Sep 2017
Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 24 Aug 2010
Rd 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 27 Sep 2019 |
Director | 30 Nov 2004 - current |
Mark Alan Begovich
Rd 1, Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 26 Sep 2017
Morrinsville, 3371
Address used since 24 Aug 2010 |
Director | 30 Nov 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cooper Aitken & Partners Ltd, 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Physical & registered | 08 Sep 2005 - 01 Sep 2011 |
C/-cooper Aitken & Partners, 42 Moorhouse Street, Morrinsville | Registered & physical | 30 Nov 2004 - 08 Sep 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ca Trustees (m & J Begovich) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030343092 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Morrinsville Null 3300 |
28 May 2013 - current |
Begovich, Mark Allan Individual |
Rd 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
14 Aug 2018 - current |
Begovich, Judith Susan Individual |
Rd 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
30 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Begovich, Judith Susan Individual |
Rd 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
30 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Begovich, Mark Allan Individual |
Rd 1 Morrinsville 3371 |
14 Aug 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Begovich, Mark Alan Individual |
Morrinsville 3371 |
30 Nov 2004 - 14 Aug 2018 |
Begovich, Mark Alan Individual |
Morrinsville 3371 |
30 Nov 2004 - 14 Aug 2018 |
Tompkins Wake Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037279097 Company Number: 1031302 Entity |
30 Nov 2004 - 28 May 2013 | |
Begovich, Mark Alan Individual |
Morrinsville 3371 |
30 Nov 2004 - 14 Aug 2018 |
Tompkins Wake Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037279097 Company Number: 1031302 Entity |
30 Nov 2004 - 28 May 2013 |
Miranda Dairy Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |
|
Action Developments (2013) Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |
|
Cms Auto & Marine Upholstery Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |
|
Timesmart Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |
|
Solar Partners NZ Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |
|
Solar Quote Comparison Limited 42 Moorhouse Street |