Qfenz Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035087366) was launched on 15 Nov 2004. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 22-24 Victoria Street, Cambridge (type: registered, physical). 41 Empire Street, Cambridge had been their physical address, up until 27 Jul 2006. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Fegan, John William Richard (an individual) located at Cambridge, Cambridge postcode 3434. Our database was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Hogans Ltd, 22-24 Victoria Street, Cambridge | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 20 Jul 2006 |
22-24 Victoria Street, Cambridge | Registered | 27 Jul 2006 |
Hogans, 22-24 Victoria Street, Cambridge | Physical & service | 27 Jul 2006 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John William Richard Fegan
Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 18 Jan 2010
Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620
Address used since 03 Aug 2017 |
Director | 15 Nov 2004 - current |
Rosemary Helen Fegan
Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Whangamata, Whangamata, 3620
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 08 May 2014 |
Director | 08 May 2014 - current |
Arno Van Niekerk
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 08 May 2014 |
Director | 08 May 2014 - 03 Aug 2017 |
Shaun Conrad Wilson
R.d.2, Matamata,
Address used since 20 Jul 2006 |
Director | 15 Nov 2004 - 24 Feb 2011 |
Victor Raymond Leach
Waller Road, Puni, Pukekohe,
Address used since 15 Nov 2004 |
Director | 15 Nov 2004 - 08 Jun 2006 |
Stuart Alan Burgess
Westmere, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Nov 2004 |
Director | 15 Nov 2004 - 08 Jun 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
41 Empire Street, Cambridge | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2006 - 27 Jul 2006 |
Polson Higgs & Co, Clarendon Tower, Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 15 Nov 2004 - 15 Jun 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fegan, John William Richard Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
15 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Shaun Conrad Individual |
R.d.2 Matamata |
15 Nov 2004 - 25 Feb 2011 |
Van Niekerk, Arno Individual |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 |
08 May 2014 - 03 Aug 2017 |
Burgess, Stuart Alan Individual |
Westmere Auckland |
15 Nov 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Leach, Victor Raymond Individual |
Waller Road Puni, Pukekohe |
15 Nov 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Firenze Holdings Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
|
Rangea Farm Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
|
Findlay Livestock 2012 Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
|
Nj Hinton & Associates Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
|
Putaruru Tyres Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |
|
Ken Riddle Livestock (2010) Limited 22-24 Victoria Street |