Winfield Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429035103387) was incorporated on 17 Nov 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga had been their registered address, until 08 Sep 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Charters, Richard Thomas (an individual) located at 85D Oceanbeach Road, Mt Maunganui postcode 3116,
Charters, Claire Winfield Ihipera (an individual) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
37 Monmouth Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Barbara Mae Charters
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 04 Aug 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2004 - current |
Richard Thomas Charters
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 04 Aug 2015 |
Director | 17 Nov 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
30 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 13 Jul 2018 - 08 Sep 2020 |
1182 Haupapa Street, Rotorua | Registered & physical | 17 Nov 2004 - 13 Jul 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Charters, Richard Thomas Individual |
85d Oceanbeach Road Mt Maunganui 3116 |
17 Nov 2004 - current |
Charters, Claire Winfield Ihipera Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
23 Aug 2022 - current |
Nga Kohungahunga O Rotorua Trust 44 A Haupapa Street |
|
Indigenuity Limited 1186 Haupapa Street |
|
Te Arawa Management Limited 1194 Haupapa Street |
|
Te Kotahitanga O Te Arawa Waka Fisheries Trust Board 1192 Haupapa Street |
|
Cascais Enterprises Limited Tutanekai Street |
|
Friends Of The Rotorua District Library Incorporated C/o Rotorua Public Library |