Lee Maxwell and Associates Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035120834) was registered on 20 Oct 2004. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 65 Tane Road, Laingholm, Auckland, 0604 (type: registered, service). 136 Opanuku Road, Henderson Valley, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 14 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Fagan, Andrew David (an individual) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Hay, Karyn Lee Maxwell (an individual) - located at Grey Lynn, Auckland. Businesscheck's database was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
136 Opanuku Road, Henderson Valley, Auckland, 0612 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 21 Sep 2015 |
13 Selbourne Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Sep 2020 |
65 Tane Road, Laingholm, Auckland, 0604 | Registered & service | 12 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Karyn Lee Maxwell Hay
Laingholm, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 04 Sep 2023
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 04 Sep 2020
Henderson Valley, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 21 Sep 2015 |
Director | 20 Oct 2004 - current |
Andrew David Fagan
Laingholm, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 04 Sep 2023
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 04 Sep 2020
Henderson Valley, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 21 Sep 2015 |
Director | 20 Oct 2004 - current |
Robert Keith Maxwell Hay
19 Tanoa Place, Glendene, Waitakere, 0602
Address used since 23 Sep 2009 |
Director | 09 Mar 2009 - 09 Sep 2013 |
Shirley Anne Hay
Glendene, Waitakere,
Address used since 09 Mar 2009 |
Director | 09 Mar 2009 - 12 Jun 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
136 Opanuku Road, Henderson Valley, Auckland, 0612 | Physical & registered | 29 Sep 2015 - 14 Sep 2020 |
11 Kopiko Road, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 | Registered & physical | 17 Sep 2013 - 29 Sep 2015 |
11 Kopiko Rd, Titirangi, Waitakere City | Registered & physical | 20 Oct 2004 - 17 Sep 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fagan, Andrew David Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
20 Oct 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hay, Karyn Lee Maxwell Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
20 Oct 2004 - current |
Drink Tea Limited 120 Opanuku Road |
|
Time Space - Pet Urns Limited 116 Opanuku Road |
|
Hobbs Electrical 2016 Limited 108 Opanuku Road |
|
Little Cracker Productions Limited 162 Opanuku Road |
|
Boxx Containers Limited 166 Opanuku Road |
|
Axio Investments Limited 98 Opanuku Road |