H C Trustees Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035127949) was registered on 18 Oct 2004. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (type: registered, physical). 390 Montreal Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 23 Jul 2018. 10 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Wilfred, Harmon Lynn (a director) located at Lincoln postcode 7608. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Other (Address for Records) | 04 Jun 2015 |
390 Montreal Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 22 Jun 2017 |
Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Jul 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Harmon Lynn Wilfred
Lincoln, 7608
Address used since 20 Jun 2022
Lincoln, Lincoln, 7608
Address used since 30 Jan 2020 |
Director | 30 Jan 2020 - current |
Brenton John Joseph Manfred Hunt
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 13 Jul 2018 |
Director | 13 Jul 2018 - 31 Jan 2020 |
Bevan John James Stone
Sumner, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 18 Oct 2004 |
Director | 18 Oct 2004 - 13 Jul 2018 |
Meri Gibson
Fendalton, Christchurch,
Address used since 18 Oct 2004 |
Director | 18 Oct 2004 - 24 Apr 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
390 Montreal Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 30 Jun 2017 - 23 Jul 2018 |
132b Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 12 Jun 2015 - 30 Jun 2017 |
C/-dallison Stone, 132b Victoria Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 13 Jun 2012 - 12 Jun 2015 |
C/-dallison Stone, Level 8, 137 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 07 May 2008 - 13 Jun 2012 |
C/-lane Neave Lawyers, L15, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 09 Jun 2006 - 07 May 2008 |
Bdo Spicers (christchurch) Ltd, Level 6, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 09 Aug 2005 - 09 Jun 2006 |
C/-leech & Partners Ltd, Chartered, Accountants, Level 1, 233 Cambridge, Tce, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2004 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilfred, Harmon Lynn Director |
Lincoln 7608 |
25 Feb 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hunt, Brenton John Joseph Manfred Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
13 Jul 2018 - 25 Feb 2020 |
Stone, Bevan John James Individual |
Sumner Christchurch |
18 Oct 2004 - 13 Jul 2018 |
Pauwels, Meri Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch |
18 Oct 2004 - 15 Apr 2008 |
Dalton Properties Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |
|
Easylawn Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |
|
Yella Digga Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |
|
Quantum Developments Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |
|
Carmen Relax Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |
|
Malone Property Limited Unit 3, 245 St Asaph Street |