Downer Utilities New Zealand Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035169505) was started on 23 Sep 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 130 Kerrs Road, Wiri, Auckland, 2104 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 8 Hugo Johnston Drive, Penrose, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 24 Nov 2014. Downer Utilities New Zealand Limited used more aliases, namely: Tenix New Zealand Limited from 22 Mar 2010 to 14 Nov 2014, Tenix Alliance New Zealand Services Limited (02 Nov 2005 to 22 Mar 2010) and Powerco Energy Services Eastern Limited (23 Sep 2004 - 02 Nov 2005). 2 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 2 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Acn 116 214 307 - Downer Utilities New Zealand Pty Ltd (an other) located at 39 Delhi Road, North Ryde postcode 2113. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
130 Kerrs Road, Wiri, Auckland, 2104 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Nov 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Evan Charles Jensen
Karaka, Papakura, 2113
Address used since 14 Dec 2018 |
Director | 14 Dec 2018 - current |
Robert John Regan
Rose Bay, Nsw, 2029
Address used since 04 Mar 2019
39 Delhi Road, North Ryde Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 04 Mar 2019 - current |
Murray Edward Robertson
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Dec 2022 |
Director | 01 Dec 2022 - current |
Malcolm Robert Ashcroft
Balgowlah Heights, Nsw, 2093
Address used since 15 Jun 2023 |
Director | 15 Jun 2023 - current |
Michael James Ferguson
39 Delhi Road, North Ryde Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Maroubra, Nsw, 2035
Address used since 10 Aug 2016
39 Delhi Road, North Ryde Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 10 Aug 2016 - 15 Jun 2023 |
Stephen Laurence Killeen
Rd 2, Lake Hawea, 9382
Address used since 04 Oct 2021
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 26 Jan 2021
Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 21 Jul 2017
Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 02 Mar 2017 |
Director | 02 Mar 2017 - 01 Dec 2022 |
Peter John Tompkins
39 Delhi Road, North Ryde, Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
39 Delhi Road, North Ryde, Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Coogee, Nsw, 2034
Address used since 31 Oct 2014 |
Director | 31 Oct 2014 - 04 Mar 2019 |
Janie Elizabeth Elrick
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 29 Jun 2018 |
Director | 29 Jun 2018 - 10 Dec 2018 |
Janice Christine Johnson
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 27 Oct 2017 |
Director | 27 Oct 2017 - 29 Jun 2018 |
Roger William Jarrold
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 31 Oct 2014 |
Director | 31 Oct 2014 - 27 Oct 2017 |
Cornelus Wilhelmus Bruyn
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 07 Aug 2015 |
Director | 07 Aug 2015 - 16 Jan 2017 |
Paul Salteri
Level 7, 60 Carrington Street, Sydney Nsw 2000, Australia,
Address used since 29 May 2006 |
Director | 31 Oct 2005 - 31 Oct 2014 |
Robert Salteri
Level 7, 60 Carrington Street, Sydney Nsw 2000, Australia,
Address used since 29 May 2006 |
Director | 31 Oct 2005 - 31 Oct 2014 |
Michael Skinner Lindsay
Gladesville Nsw 2111, Australia,
Address used since 23 Nov 2009 |
Director | 23 Nov 2009 - 31 Oct 2014 |
Carlo Salteri
Level 7, 60 Carrington Street, Sydney Nsw 2000, Australia,
Address used since 29 May 2006 |
Director | 31 Oct 2005 - 12 Oct 2010 |
Jeffrey Wayne Kendrew
New Plymouth, Taranaki,
Address used since 17 Dec 2004 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - 31 Oct 2005 |
Euan Richard Krogh
New Plymouth, Taranaki,
Address used since 02 Aug 2005 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - 31 Oct 2005 |
Sriyan Elanga Ekanayake
Highlands Park, New Plymouth,
Address used since 17 Dec 2004 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - 31 Oct 2005 |
Steven Ronald Boulton
New Plymouth, Taranaki,
Address used since 17 Dec 2004 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - 31 Oct 2005 |
Nigel Dickson Barbour
Oakura, Taranaki,
Address used since 17 Dec 2004 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - 31 Oct 2005 |
Ian Andrew Wilson
Palmerston North,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Barry Raymond Upson
Inglewood,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Kinsley Neville Sampson
New Plymouth,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
James Harold Ogden
Whitby, Wellington,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Judith Rae Timpany
Wanganui,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Ian Donald Lobb
New Plymouth,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
John Sutherland Auld
New Plymouth,
Address used since 23 Sep 2004 |
Director | 23 Sep 2004 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 8 Hugo Johnston Drive, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical | 22 Jul 2014 - 24 Nov 2014 |
7a Pacific Rise, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered | 17 Jul 2012 - 22 Jul 2014 |
8 Hugo Johnston Drive, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered | 09 Aug 2010 - 17 Jul 2012 |
17 Maurice Street, Penrose, Auckland | Registered & physical | 18 Dec 2007 - 09 Aug 2010 |
35 Junction Street, New Plymouth, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 09 Nov 2005 - 18 Dec 2007 |
Level 2, Council Chambers, 84 Liardet Street, New Plymouth | Registered & physical | 23 Sep 2004 - 09 Nov 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Acn 116 214 307 - Downer Utilities New Zealand Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
39 Delhi Road North Ryde 2113 |
02 Nov 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Powerco Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036665167 Company Number: 1181511 Entity |
23 Sep 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Powerco Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036665167 Company Number: 1181511 Entity |
23 Sep 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Downer Edi Limited |
Type | Asx Listed Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | AU |
Address |
Triniti Business Campus 39 Delhi Road, North Ryde Nsw 2113 |
Green Vision Recycling Limited 130 Kerrs Road |
|
Downer New Zealand Projects 1 Limited 130 Kerrs Road |
|
Works Finance (nz) Limited 130 Kerrs Road |
|
Downer New Zealand Projects 2 Limited 130 Kerrs Road |
|
Dgl Investments Limited 130 Kerrs Road |
|
Techtel Training & Development Limited 130 Kerrs Road |