Gracey Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035312352) was registered on 25 Jun 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 59 Queens Drive, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: registered, physical). Rear Suite, Level 1, 29 Kings Crescent, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, until 13 Oct 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Hopkirk, Tracey Kathleen (an individual) located at Petone, Lower Hutt postcode 5012. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Hopkirk, Graeme Douglas (an individual) - located at Petone, Lower Hutt. "Financial asset investing" (business classification K624010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Gracey Holdings Limited. Our data was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
59 Queens Drive, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Graeme Douglas Hopkirk
Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 28 Jul 2017
Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5010
Address used since 28 Jul 2015 |
Director | 25 Jun 2004 - current |
Tracey Kathleen Hopkirk
Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 28 Jul 2017
Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Apr 2014 |
Director | 25 Jun 2004 - 04 Dec 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Rear Suite, Level 1, 29 Kings Crescent, Lower Hutt | Registered | 09 Jul 2009 - 13 Oct 2020 |
Rear Suite, Level 1, 29 Kings Cres, Lower Hutt | Physical | 09 Jul 2009 - 13 Oct 2020 |
C/-crombie Associates, 29 Kings Cres, Lower Hutt | Physical & registered | 09 Aug 2006 - 09 Jul 2009 |
C/-sherwin Chan & Walshe, Level 6 Westfield Towe, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 25 Jun 2004 - 09 Aug 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hopkirk, Tracey Kathleen Individual |
Petone Lower Hutt 5012 |
25 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hopkirk, Graeme Douglas Individual |
Petone Lower Hutt 5012 |
25 Jun 2004 - current |
Te Moana Limited Rear Suite, Level 1 |
|
Tudobem Limited 29 Kings Crescent |
|
Aj Pietras & Co Limited 29 Kings Crescent |
|
Have A Happy Day Limited 29 Kings Crescent |
|
Alexander Sasse Cardiology Limited Rear Suite, Level 1 |
|
Discount Auto Accessories 2010 Limited Rear Suite, Level 1 |
Dgm Business Group Limited 81 Queens Grove |
Magnetic Enterprises Limited 15 Marina Grove |
Tambourine Trustee Limited 1 Knights Road |
Tbhc Trustee Company No 4 Limited 37 Te Mome Road |
Florence Company Limited 37 Te Mome Road |
Mirichcat Options Limited 1 Crestview Grove |