G Sanders Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035332954) was incorporated on 17 Jun 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 (type: registered, physical). C/-Shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha had been their physical address, up until 12 Aug 2011. 1184002 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 29600 shares (2.5% of shares), namely:
Sanders, Daphne June (an individual) located at Rd 2, Milton postcode 9292. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2.5% of all shares (exactly 29600 shares); it includes
Sanders, Louise Helen (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Milton. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1095202 shares, 92.5%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
O'malley & Co Nominees (2016) Limited, located at Balclutha, Balclutha (an entity),
Sanders, Louise Helen, located at Rd 2, Milton (an individual),
Shand Thomson Nominees Limited, located at Balclutha, Balclutha (an entity). Our database was updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
102 Clyde Street, Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Aug 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gary John Sanders
Rd 2, Milton, 9292
Address used since 05 Aug 2015 |
Director | 17 Jun 2004 - current |
Louise Helen Sanders
Rd 2, Milton, 9292
Address used since 11 Apr 2019 |
Director | 11 Apr 2019 - current |
George Campbell Sanders
Rd 2, Milton, 9292
Address used since 05 Aug 2015 |
Director | 17 Jun 2004 - 17 Jul 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-shand Thomson Ltd, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha | Physical | 17 Jun 2004 - 12 Aug 2011 |
C/-shand Thomson Limited, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha | Registered | 17 Jun 2004 - 12 Aug 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sanders, Daphne June Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sanders, Louise Helen Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'malley & Co Nominees (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042287766 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 |
17 Aug 2017 - current |
Sanders, Louise Helen Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - current |
Shand Thomson Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036797134 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Balclutha Balclutha 9230 |
17 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders, George Campbell Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 19 Jul 2016 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders Dec'd, George Campbell Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
19 Jul 2016 - 07 Feb 2018 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanders, Gary John Individual |
Rd 2 Milton 9292 |
17 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
Sanson Farming Co Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Tim White Electrical Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Glensdale Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Clarke Agri Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Hewitt Dairy Enterprises Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Trk Farm Limited 102 Clyde Street |