Spb Investments Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035365679) was started on 28 Jun 2004. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 2, Building 5, 62 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, physical). Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland had been their registered address, until 31 May 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Bull, Stephen Paul (an individual) located at Northcote Point, Auckland postcode 0627,
Bull, Robert John (an individual) located at Milford, Auckland postcode 0620. Our information was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 6, East On Quay, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland | Other (Address For Share Register) | 17 May 2005 |
Level 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Other (Address For Share Register) & records & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 31 May 2019 |
Level 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 11 Jun 2019 |
Level 2, Building 5, 62 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 31 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Bull
Northcote Point, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 20 Mar 2015 |
Director | 28 Jun 2004 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Building 5, 62 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 31 May 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Building 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, Highbrook, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 17 Jun 2019 - 31 May 2023 |
Level 6, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 11 Jun 2019 - 17 Jun 2019 |
Level 6, Nzinvest House, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 06 Jun 2017 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Level 6, East On Quay, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland | Physical & registered | 24 May 2005 - 06 Jun 2017 |
6 Mahuhu Crescent, Parnell, Auckland | Physical & registered | 28 Jun 2004 - 24 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bull, Stephen Paul Individual |
Northcote Point Auckland 0627 |
28 Jun 2004 - current |
Bull, Robert John Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
28 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Glaister Ennor Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038226489 Company Number: 828607 Entity |
28 Jun 2004 - 01 Jun 2017 | |
Glaister Ennor Trustee Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038226489 Company Number: 828607 Entity |
28 Jun 2004 - 01 Jun 2017 |
Aman And Ameet Holdings Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Fames5 Investments Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Valdo Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
Durbin Holding Limited Level 6, East On Quay |
|
R Bull Enterprises Limited Level 6, Nzinvest House |
|
Picinini Property Invest Limited Level 6, East On Quay |