Port Road Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035441595) was registered on 20 Apr 2004. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 65504, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0754 (type: postal, office). 67 Churchill Road, Murrays Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, until 05 Feb 2018. Port Road Limited used other aliases, namely: Styca Holdings Limited from 20 Apr 2004 to 16 Jul 2004. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Heatley, Craig Leonard (an individual) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622,
Pyle, Hayley Maree (an individual) located at Murrays Bay, Auckland postcode 0630,
Heatley, Nicholas Craig (an individual) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622. Our database was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
10c Brett Avenue, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Feb 2018 |
Po Box 65504, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0754 | Postal | 07 Nov 2019 |
65 Gulf View Road, Murrays Bay, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Office | 07 Nov 2019 |
Gulf View Road, Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Delivery | 07 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Leonard Heatley
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 08 Oct 2020
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 26 May 2015 |
Director | 16 Jul 2004 - current |
Lisa Maree Tauber
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 20 Apr 2004 |
Director | 20 Apr 2004 - 16 Jul 2004 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Gulf View Road, Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Delivery | 07 Nov 2019 |
65 Gulf View Road, Murrays Bay , Mairangi Bay , Auckland , 0630 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
67 Churchill Road, Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 30 Jul 2015 - 05 Feb 2018 |
Level 1, 112 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2013 - 30 Jul 2015 |
19a O'neills Avenue, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical | 26 Jul 2004 - 18 Oct 2013 |
187 Orakei Road, Remuera, Auckland | Registered & physical | 20 Apr 2004 - 26 Jul 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heatley, Craig Leonard Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
28 Nov 2005 - current |
Pyle, Hayley Maree Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 |
28 Nov 2005 - current |
Heatley, Nicholas Craig Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horton, Gregory Bernard Individual |
48 Shortland St Auckland 1010 |
02 Mar 2012 - 26 May 2015 |
Heatley, Katherine Mary Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Heatley, Sophia Louise Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
02 Mar 2012 - 10 Oct 2013 |
Foley, Michael John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - 06 Sep 2022 |
Foley, Michael John Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - 06 Sep 2022 |
Heatley, Katherine Mary Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - 05 Sep 2022 |
Tetro, David Individual |
Milford |
28 Nov 2005 - 18 Aug 2011 |
Tauber, Lisa Maree Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
20 Apr 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Heatley, Sophia Louise Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
26 May 2015 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Heatley, Benjamin Alexander Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
02 Mar 2012 - 10 Oct 2013 |
Spanish Bay Limited 10c Brett Avenue |
|
Port Road Three Limited 10c Brett Avenue |
|
Allan Clarke Forests Limited 10a Brett Avenue |
|
A & M Clarke Trustees Limited 10a Brett Avenue |
|
Port Road Trustee Limited 10c Brett Avenue |
|
Port Road Two Limited 10c Brett Avenue |