Lustre Limited (issued a business number of 9429035447221) was registered on 14 Apr 2004. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, registered). Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 08 Sep 2022. Lustre Limited used more names, namely: Sce Restorations Limited from 14 Apr 2004 to 28 May 2008. 200 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Gagas, Konstandinos (an individual) located at Botany Downs, Manukau postcode 2010. Our information was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Registered | 24 Apr 2014 |
Po Box 28021, Remuera, Auckland, 1541 | Postal | 10 Apr 2019 |
24 Eric Paton Way, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Office & delivery | 10 Apr 2019 |
24 Eric Paton Way, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Physical & service | 08 Sep 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Konstandinos Gagas
Sunnyhills, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 31 Mar 2023
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 20 Apr 2017
Botany Downs, Manukau, 2010
Address used since 30 Apr 2011 |
Director | 14 Apr 2004 - current |
Andrew Bruce Parkinson
Rd 1, Warkworth, 0981
Address used since 01 Apr 2019
Rd1, Warkworth, Auckland, 0981
Address used since 12 Apr 2018
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 30 Apr 2011 |
Director | 14 Apr 2004 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Lawrence Leslie Loveday
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Apr 2004 |
Director | 14 Apr 2004 - 11 Mar 2009 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
24 Eric Paton Way, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Physical & service | 08 Sep 2022 |
116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 29 May 2023 |
Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 02 Nov 2023 |
24 Eric Paton Way , Saint Johns , Auckland , 1072 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical | 24 Apr 2014 - 08 Sep 2022 |
C/- Alliott Nz Ltd, Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 23 Mar 2011 - 24 Apr 2014 |
C/o Alliott Nz Ltd, 109 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & registered | 28 Mar 2008 - 23 Mar 2011 |
Alliott Thompson Francis, Chartered Accountants, 109 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket,auckland | Registered & physical | 14 Apr 2004 - 28 Mar 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gagas, Konstandinos Individual |
Botany Downs Manukau 2010 |
14 Apr 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stone Craft Manufacturing Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037304140 Company Number: 1026200 Entity |
Takapuna, Northshore Auckland 0622 |
14 Apr 2004 - 31 Mar 2023 |
Property Solutions (nz) Limited Level 3, 507 Lake Road |
|
Kowhai Concepts Limited Level 1, 507 Lake Road |
|
Chatfield Engineering (2013) Limited Level 1, 507 Lake Road |
|
Kohi Trust Limited Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road |
|
Galloway Property Investments Limited Level 10, 19 Como Street, |
|
C Dumper Osteopath Limited Level 1, 507 Lake Road |