Wharehunga Forestry (2004) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035511922) was incorporated on 18 Mar 2004. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 44 Robins Road, Queenstown, 9300 (type: registered, physical). 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim had been their registered address, up until 05 Mar 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Hadley, James William Peter (an individual) located at Queenstown. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 45 per cent of all shares (45 shares); it includes
Shepperson, Sean Vereker (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland,
Shepperson, Andrea (an individual) - located at Remuera, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (25 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Reese, Rachel Hadley, located at 9 Acorn Way, Stoke, Nelson (an individual). Our database was last updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Robins Road, Queenstown, 9300 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 25 Feb 2015 |
44 Robins Road, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Mar 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sean Vereker Shepperson
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 27 Feb 2007 |
Director | 18 Mar 2004 - current |
James William Peter Hadley
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 14 Feb 2012 |
Director | 18 Mar 2004 - current |
James Alexander Hadley
Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 18 Mar 2004 |
Director | 18 Mar 2004 - 19 Jul 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
65 Seymour Street, Blenheim | Registered & physical | 03 Apr 2006 - 05 Mar 2015 |
43 High Street, Blenheim | Physical & registered | 18 Mar 2004 - 03 Apr 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hadley, James William Peter Individual |
Queenstown |
18 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shepperson, Sean Vereker Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
18 Mar 2004 - current |
Shepperson, Andrea Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
18 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reese, Rachel Hadley Individual |
9 Acorn Way, Stoke Nelson 7011 |
18 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hadley, James Alexander Individual |
Blenheim |
18 Mar 2004 - 12 Nov 2010 |
Hadley Consultants Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Land Landscape Architects Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Fitzgerald Cove Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Robins Road Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Hadley Management Services Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Wharehunga Forestry Limited 44 Robins Road |