Keet Consulting Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035549062) was incorporated on 26 Feb 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 39 Weranui Road, Waiwera, Orewa, 0994 (type: physical, registered). 33 John Downs Drive, Browns Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 16 Mar 2018. Keet Consulting Limited used other names, namely: Case Management Consulting Limited from 26 Feb 2004 to 31 May 2007. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Keet, Sylvia (an individual) located at Orewa postcode 0994. "Service to insurance nec" (business classification K642060) is the category the ABS issued Keet Consulting Limited. Our data was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
39 Weranui Road, Waiwera, Orewa, 0994 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Mar 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sylvia Keet
Orewa, 0994
Address used since 01 Oct 2017
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 04 Aug 2012 |
Director | 26 Feb 2004 - current |
Leigh Maxwell Cowden
Redvale, North Shore, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 01 Mar 2007 |
39 Weranui Road , Waiwera , Orewa , 0994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33 John Downs Drive, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 11 Aug 2014 - 16 Mar 2018 |
4 Orbit Drive, G Building, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 30 Jul 2012 - 11 Aug 2014 |
33 John Downs Drive, Browns Bay, Auckland | Physical & registered | 26 Feb 2004 - 30 Jul 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Keet, Sylvia Individual |
Orewa 0994 |
05 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cowden, Leigh Maxwell Individual |
Redvale |
05 May 2005 - 05 May 2005 |
Keet, Sylvia Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland |
26 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Usn New Zealand Limited 497 Upper Waiwera Road |
|
Kays Group Investments Limited Waiwera |
|
Kays Enterprises 2003 Limited 2 Waiwera Road |
|
Ki-ski Trust 21 Waiwera Road |
|
Pacific Education Foundation 21 Waiwera Road |
|
Heaton Motors Limited 105 Jervis Road |
Triplejump Limited 528 Dairy Flat Highway |
Triplejump License Group Limited 528 Dairy Flat Highway |
Addex Limited 3/76 East Coast Rd |
Repay Limited Hillcrest |
Mclarens Group (nz) Limited Level 9 |
Belong Services Limited Level 18, 80 Queen Street |