Tui Technology Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035561064) was started on 09 Feb 2004. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 32 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, 0110 (type: registered, service). 4Th Floor, 30-34 Rathbone Street, Whangarei had been their physical address, until 05 Jul 2016. 300 shares are issued to 15 shareholders who belong to 9 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 58 shares (19.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Pingao Trustee 550 Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110,
Shiels, Gregory John (an individual) located at Lynmore, Rotorua postcode 3010,
Shiels, Sandra Ruth (an individual) located at Lynmore, Rotorua postcode 3010. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Shiels, Sandra Ruth (an individual) - located at Lynmore, Rotorua. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Shiels, Gregory John, located at Lynmore, Rotorua (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
32 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Jul 2016 |
121 Dent Street, Whangarei, Whangarei, 0110 | Postal & office | 28 Apr 2020 |
32 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & service | 21 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Aaron James Taitoko
Rd 6, Whangarei, 0176
Address used since 01 Apr 2021
Horahora, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 01 May 2017
Maunu, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 01 Apr 2011 |
Director | 09 Feb 2004 - current |
Niklas Briscoe Moore
Glenholme, Rotorua, 3010
Address used since 31 Jul 2014 |
Director | 31 Jul 2014 - current |
Gregory John Shiels
Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010
Address used since 01 Jul 2023 |
Director | 01 Jul 2023 - current |
Anthony James Davies-colley
Rd 6, Whangarei, 0176
Address used since 16 Mar 2010 |
Director | 09 Feb 2004 - 30 Jun 2016 |
Malcolm Bruce Jones
Rd 3, Matamata,
Address used since 09 Feb 2004 |
Director | 09 Feb 2004 - 10 May 2013 |
121 Dent Street , Whangarei , Whangarei , 0110 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4th Floor, 30-34 Rathbone Street, Whangarei | Physical | 04 Mar 2004 - 05 Jul 2016 |
4th Floor, 30-34 Rathbone Street, Whangarei | Registered | 04 Mar 2004 - 05 Jul 2016 |
804 State Highway 24, Rd 3, Matamata | Physical & registered | 09 Feb 2004 - 04 Mar 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pingao Trustee 550 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050844463 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
31 Jul 2023 - current |
Shiels, Gregory John Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - current |
Shiels, Sandra Ruth Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shiels, Sandra Ruth Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shiels, Gregory John Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wake, Judith Nancy Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2014 - current |
Moore, Madeleine Dawn Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2014 - current |
Moore, Niklas Briscoe Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hammonds Trustees 2019 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047643390 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 |
14 Jun 2022 - current |
Taitoko, Angela Maree Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
09 Feb 2004 - current |
Taitoko, Aaron James Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
09 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moore, Madeleine Dawn Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taitoko, Angela Maree Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
09 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taitoko, Aaron James Individual |
Rd 6 Whangarei 0176 |
09 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moore, Niklas Briscoe Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shiels, Gregory John Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - 31 Jul 2023 |
Dennis, David Brendon Individual |
Dargaville |
09 Feb 2004 - 14 Jun 2022 |
Davies_colley, Clare Individual |
Ngaratunua Rd 6, Whangarei |
09 Feb 2004 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Jones, Malcolm Bruce Individual |
Rd 3 Matamata |
09 Feb 2004 - 10 May 2013 |
Pingao Trustee 550 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050844463 Company Number: 8481346 Entity |
31 Jul 2023 - 31 Jul 2023 | |
Shiels, Sandra Ruth Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
31 Jul 2023 - 31 Jul 2023 |
Jones, Julie Mary Individual |
Rd 3 Matamata |
09 Feb 2004 - 10 May 2013 |
Jones, Julie Mary Individual |
Rd 3 Matamata |
09 Feb 2004 - 10 May 2013 |
Davies-colley, Anthony James Individual |
Ngaratunua Rd 6, Whangarei |
09 Feb 2004 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Davies-colley, Anthony James Individual |
Ngaratunua Rd 6, Whangarei |
09 Feb 2004 - 22 Nov 2016 |
Mcnab, Neil Finlay Individual |
Whangarei |
09 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2016 |
Jones, Malcolm Bruce Individual |
Rd 3 Matamata |
09 Feb 2004 - 10 May 2013 |
Tdc Business Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042264613 Company Number: 5934302 Entity |
27 Jun 2016 - 22 Nov 2016 | |
Davies-colley, Clare Individual |
Ngaratunua Rd 6, Whangarei |
09 Feb 2004 - 27 Jun 2016 |
Tdc Business Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042264613 Company Number: 5934302 Entity |
27 Jun 2016 - 22 Nov 2016 | |
Harris, Antony Individual |
Matamata |
16 Apr 2007 - 16 Apr 2007 |
Harris Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035969679 Company Number: 1306813 Entity |
23 Apr 2007 - 10 May 2013 | |
Harris Co Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035969679 Company Number: 1306813 Entity |
23 Apr 2007 - 10 May 2013 |
Mark And Gina Trustees Limited 32 Rathbone Street |
|
Wistrand Newtrax Limited 32 Rathbone Street |
|
S G Hansen Trustees Limited 32 Rathbone Street |
|
R Johnston Trustee Limited 32 Rathbone Street |
|
Goodland Farms Limited 32 Rathbone Street |
|
Lister Farm (2012) Limited 32 Rathbone Street |